EP1649571 - SUPERCONDUCTOR CURRENT LIMITING SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.07.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.08.2013 [2013/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states S C Power Systems, Inc. 999 Baker Way Suite 150 San Mateo CA 94404-1581 / US | [2007/03] |
Former [2006/17] | For all designated states METAL MANUFACTURES LIMITED 15 Merriwa Street Gordon, NSW 2072 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DARMANN, Francis, Anthony 29 Centennial Avenue Chatswood NSW 2067 / AU | [2007/27] |
Former [2006/17] | 01 /
DARMANN, Francis, Anthony 5 Glenda Place Mount Kuring-Gai, NSW 2080 / AU | Representative(s) | Zacco Denmark A/S Arne Jacobsens Allé 15 2300 Copenhagen S / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2013/03] | Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | ||
Former [2006/17] | Schwarze, Holm, et al Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | Application number, filing date | 04737527.4 | 06.07.2004 | [2006/17] | WO2004AU00906 | Priority number, date | AU20030903489 | 07.07.2003 Original published format: AU 2003903489 | [2006/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005004299 | Date: | 13.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1649571 | Date: | 26.04.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 13.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H02H9/02, H01L39/16 | [2006/17] | CPC: |
H02H9/023 (EP,US);
H02H9/08 (EP,US);
Y02E40/60 (EP,US);
Y10S505/85 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SUPRALEITER-STROMBEGRENZUNGSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN | [2006/17] | English: | SUPERCONDUCTOR CURRENT LIMITING SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2006/17] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE LIMITATION DE COURANT SUPRACONDUCTEUR | [2006/17] | Entry into regional phase | 07.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 07.02.2006 | Search fee paid | 07.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/17] | 01.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/33] | 12.03.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2012 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH09233687 ; | [Y]JPH08316534 ; | [Y]JPH0984259 ; | [A]JPH09233833 ; | [A]JPH1197260 ; | [X]FR2621749 (ALSTHOM [FR]); | [X]FR2650078 (ELECTRICITE DE FRANCE [FR]); | [Y]JPH099499 (HITACHI LTD); | [X]US5699219 (ARITA HIROSHI [JP], et al); | [YP]WO2004038817 (METAL MANUFACTURES LTD [AU], et al) |