EP1656131 - USE OF BETAINE FOR TREATING INTERMITTENT CLAUDICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/20] | USE OF BETAINE FOR TREATING ARTERITIS | ||
[2010/28] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.01.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 22.06.2016 [2016/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Messadek, Jallal Place des Béguinages, 2 4000 Liège / BE | [2006/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/20] | Application number, filing date | 04737684.3 | 08.07.2004 | [2006/20] | WO2004BE00101 | Priority number, date | BE20030000408 | 15.07.2003 Original published format: BE 200300408 | [2006/20] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005004854 | Date: | 20.01.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1656131 | Date: | 17.05.2006 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1656131 | Date: | 02.03.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/205, A61K31/616, A61P9/00, A61P9/14, A61P9/10, A61P7/10, A61P37/02, A61P15/10 | [2006/20] | CPC: |
A61K31/205 (EP,US);
A61K31/616 (EP,US);
A61P15/10 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P7/10 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/205, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/616, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON BETAIN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON CLAUDICATIO INTERMITTENS | [2010/28] | English: | USE OF BETAINE FOR TREATING INTERMITTENT CLAUDICATION | [2010/28] | French: | UTILISATION DE LA BETAINE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE LA CLAUDICATION INTERMITTENTE | [2010/28] |
Former [2006/20] | VERWENDUNG VON BETAIN ZUR | ||
Former [2006/20] | USE OF BETAINE FOR TREATING ARTERITIS | ||
Former [2006/20] | UTILISATION DE LA BETAINE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DES ARTERITES | Entry into regional phase | 14.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 14.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.02.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/20] | 19.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.06.2010 | 15.06.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 18.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2007 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   05.12.2007 | 31.07.2008 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   11.12.2008 | 31.07.2009 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   25.11.2009 | 31.07.2010 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   22.12.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 02.03.2011 | EE | 02.03.2011 | FI | 02.03.2011 | IE | 02.03.2011 | RO | 02.03.2011 | SI | 02.03.2011 | SK | 02.03.2011 | TR | 02.03.2011 | BG | 02.06.2011 | AT | 08.07.2011 | PL | 08.07.2011 | HU | 09.07.2011 | MC | 31.07.2011 | [2016/25] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 02.03.2011 | |
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
IE | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
TR | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
AT | 08.07.2011 | ||
PL | 08.07.2011 | ||
HU | 09.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2013/21] | CY | 02.03.2011 | |
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
IE | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
AT | 08.07.2011 | ||
PL | 08.07.2011 | ||
HU | 09.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 02.03.2011 | |
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
IE | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
AT | 08.07.2011 | ||
PL | 08.07.2011 | ||
HU | 09.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2013/07] | CY | 02.03.2011 | |
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
IE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
AT | 08.07.2011 | ||
PL | 08.07.2011 | ||
HU | 09.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 02.03.2011 | |
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
IE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
PL | 08.07.2011 | ||
HU | 09.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | CY | 02.03.2011 | |
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
IE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
HU | 09.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | CY | 02.03.2011 | |
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
IE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/51] | CY | 02.03.2011 | |
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
IE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | CY | 02.03.2011 | |
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
IE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 02.03.2011 | |
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2119889 (VEGETTI TIBERIO) [X] 1,2,7-18,24,29,32 * page 1, line 1 - line 23 * * page 2, line 22 - line 24 * * page 3, line 19 - line 23 * * claims 1,2 *; | [A]WO9515750 (HASHIM SAMI A [US]) [A] 1-5,7-21,23,24,29,32,33 * page 1, paragraph 2 * * page 5, paragraph 2 * * page 69, paragraph 2 - paragraph 4 * * page 10, paragraph 2 - page 11, paragraph 3 * * example 1 * * claims 1,2,8,10,12,13 *; | [X]US5716941 (RABINOFF MICHAEL [US]) [X] 1-4,7-20,29,32,33 * column 1, line 9 - line 12 * * column 2, line 42 - line 50 * * column 3, line 44 - line 52 * * column 4, line 24 - line 34 * * column 5, line 1 - line 12 *; | [XA]WO9819690 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US]) [X] 1,2,7-18,29,32 * page 1, line 4 - line 10 * * page 3, line 19 - line 33 * * page 5, line 7 - line 20 * * page 6, line 16 - line 19 * * page 10, line 20 - page 11, line 9 * * claims 16-19 * [A] 3,4,19,20,33; | [DX]WO0025764 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE], et al) [DX] 1-3,7-19,29,32 * page 2, line 16 - page 3, line 2 * * page 5, line 16 - page 6, line 8 * * page 7, line 1 - line 3 * * page 9, line 1 - line 5 * * page 10, line 25 - page 11, line 20 * * example 1 * * claims 1,2,7-11 *; | [DA]WO02062322 (MESSADEK JALLAL [BE]) [DA] 1-3,5,7-19,21,23,24,29,32 * page 1, line 5 - line 9 * * page 7, line 11 - line 26 * * page 20, line 11 - line 21 * * page 27, line 24 - page 28, line 4 * * examples 29,30,33 *; | [X]US2002183380 (HUNTER WILLIAM L [CA]) [X] 1-3,5,7-17,21,23,24,29,32 * page 1, paragraph 2 * * page 3, paragraph 29 * * page 12, paragraphs 139,140 * * page 11, paragraph 130 * * pages 23-24, paragraphs 213-215 * * pages 24-25, paragraph 223 * * pages 25-26, paragraphs 227,228 * * pages 29-30, paragraphs 255-257 *; | [DPX]WO2004049095 (MESSADEK JALLAL [BE], et al) [DPX] 1-22,29,32,33 * page 1, line 5 - line 24 * * page 7, line 16 - page 8, line 3 * * page 10, line 15 - line 20 * * page 17, line 24 - page 18, line 8 * * page 25, line 4 - line 27 * * page 30, line 26 - page 31, line 7 * * examples 1,3 * * page 62, line 10 - line 14 * * page 64, line 15 - line 20 * * page 65, line 1 - line 5 * * page 68, line 4 - line 6 ** claims 1,9,14,15,40 *; | [Y] - "BETAINE FOR HOMOCYSTINURIA", MEDICAL LETTER ON DRUGS AND THERAPEUTICS, NEW ROCHELLE, NY, US, (19970131), vol. 39, no. 993, ISSN 0025-732X, page 12, XP000853853 [Y] 1-4,7-20,23,24,32,33 * the whole document * | [Y] - MALINOW M R (REPRINT), "PLASMA HOMOCYST(E)INE AND ARTERIAL OCCLUSIVE DISEASES - A MINIREVIEW", CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, (JAN 1995) VOL. 41, NO. 1, PP. 173-176. ISSN: 0009-9147., (199501), XP008039186 [Y] 1-3,32 * page 173, column 1, paragraphs 1,2 * * page 175, column 1, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * * page 175, column 2, paragraph 3 * | [Y] - AL-AWAMI M ET AL, "Homocysteine levels in patients with Raynaud's phenomenon", VASA - JOURNAL OF VASCULAR DISEASES 2002 SWITZERLAND, (2002), vol. 31, no. 2, ISSN 0301-1526, pages 87 - 90, XP008039171 [Y] 23 * abstract * * page 88, column 1, paragraph 2 * * page 89, column 1, paragraph 7 - column 2, paragraph 1 * | [Y] - DIDIER A -F ET AL, "Distal cutaneous necrosis, an unusual etiology: Hyperhomocysteinemia", ANNALES DE DERMATOLOGIE ET DE VENEREOLOGIE, (199911), vol. 126, no. 11, ISSN 0151-9638, pages 822 - 825, XP008039169 [Y] 1-4,7-20,32,33 * abstract * * page 823, column 2, paragraph 3 - page 824, column 1, paragraph 1 * | [Y] - STAMMLER F ET AL, "Prevalence of hyperhomocysteinaemia in thrombangiitis obliterans (Buerger's disease): Does homocysteine play a pathogenetic role?", DMW (DEUTSCHE MEDIZINISCHE WOCHENSCHRIFT), (1996), vol. 121, no. 46, ISSN 0012-0472, pages 1417 - 1423, XP008039176 [Y] 24 * abstract * * page 1421, column 1, paragraph 1 * | Examination | - HIATT WILLIAM R., "Medical treatment of peripheral arterial disease and claudication", NEW ENGLAND JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, (20010524), vol. 344, no. 21, doi:doi:10.1056/NEJM200105243442108, ISSN 0028-4793, pages 1608 - 1621, XP009006719 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJM200105243442108 | - MANGIAFICO R.A., "Pharmacotherary for intermittent claudication: from consensus-based to evidence-based treatment", VASCULAR DISEASE PREVENTION, (2004), vol. 1, doi:doi:10.2174/1567270043480869, pages 1 - 15, XP008046989 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2174/1567270043480869 | - NORVIT TRIAL INVESTIGATORS, "Homocysteine lowering and cardiovascular events after acute myocardial infarction", NEW ENGLAND JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, (200604), vol. 354, no. 15, doi:doi:10.1056/NEJMoa055227, ISSN 0028-4793, pages 1578 - 1588, XP008094823 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJMoa055227 | - LONN EVA ET AL, "Homocysteine lowering with folic acid and B vitamins in vascular disease", NEW ENGLAND JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, (200604), vol. 354, no. 15, doi:doi:10.1056/NEJMoa060900, ISSN 0028-4793, pages 1567 - 1577, XP008098038 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJMoa060900 | - DUPREZ D. ET AL, "Estimation of walking distance in intermittent claudication: Need for standardization", EUROPEAN HEART JOURNAL, (199905), vol. 20, no. 9, ISSN 0195-668X, pages 641 - 644 | - INTERNET CITATION, URL: http://www.umm.edu/patiented/articles/intermittent_claudication_other_symptoms_of_peri... |