EP1646953 - RECODED RADIX-2 PIPELINED FFT PROCESSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.01.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.02.2007 [2007/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cygnus Communications Canada Co. 320, 3553-31st Street NW Calgary, Alberta T2L 2K7 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2006/16] | For all designated states Cygnus Communications Canada Co. 253, 3553-31st Street NW Calgary, Alberta T2L 2K7 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GIBB, Sean, G. 146 Tuscany Ravine Bay NW Calgary, Alberta T3L 2S9 / CA | 02 /
GRAUMANN, Peter, J., W. 124-72 Avenue NE Calgary, Alberta T2K 0N7 / CA | [2006/16] | Representative(s) | Potter, Julian Mark, et al Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky and Popeo IP, LLP Alder Castle 10 Noble Street, London EC2V 7JX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/16] | Potter, Julian Mark, et al Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky and Popeo Intellectual Property LLP, The Rectory, 9 Ironmonger Lane London EC2V 8EY / GB | Application number, filing date | 04737862.5 | 21.06.2004 | [2006/16] | WO2004CA00923 | Priority number, date | US20030487975P | 18.07.2003 Original published format: US 487975 P | US20040760379 | 21.01.2004 Original published format: US 760379 | [2006/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005008516 | Date: | 27.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/04] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1646953 | Date: | 19.04.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/14 | [2006/16] | CPC: |
G06F17/142 (EP,US);
G06F17/14 (KR);
G06F17/10 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PIPELINE-FFT-PROZESSOR FÜR UMCODIERTE BASIS 2 | [2006/16] | English: | RECODED RADIX-2 PIPELINED FFT PROCESSOR | [2006/16] | French: | PROCESSEUR FFT PIPELINE A RADIX-2 RECODE | [2006/16] | Entry into regional phase | 06.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 06.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/16] | 27.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/09] | 16.10.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9719412 (TERACOM SVENSK RUNDRADIO [SE], et al) [A] * the whole document *; | [X]WO9938089 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1-22 * page 13, line 14 - page 20, line 16 * * figures 2B,2C,3,4,6 *; | [X] - SHOUSHENG HE ET AL, "Designing pipeline FFT processor for OFDM (de)modulation", SIGNALS, SYSTEMS, AND ELECTRONICS, 1998. ISSSE 98. 1998 URSI INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON PISA, ITALY 29 SEPT.-2 OCT. 1998, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19980929), ISBN 0-7803-4900-8, pages 257 - 262, XP010316813 [X] 1-22 * section III.B; figure 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISSSE.1998.738077 | [X] - LIHONG JIA ET AL, "A new VLSI-oriented FFT algorithm and implementation", ASIC CONFERENCE 1998. PROCEEDINGS. ELEVENTH ANNUAL IEEE INTERNATIONAL ROCHESTER, NY, USA 13-16 SEPT. 1998, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19980913), ISBN 0-7803-4980-6, pages 337 - 341, XP010309677 [X] 1-22 * section II.A; figure 2 * * section II.C; figures 7(b), 8, 9 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ASIC.1998.723029 | [A] - CHU E ET AL, Inside the FFT Black Box, USA, CRC PRESS, (2000), XP002350341 [A] 9,10,16-22 * section 12.1 * |