EP1778005 - MUSSEL SOCK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.01.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Go Deep International Inc. P.O. Box 493 Station A Fredericton NB E3B 4Z9 / CA | [2007/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FERGUSON, Kent 101 Robby's Road Masonworth, New Brunswick E3C 1M2 / CA | [2007/18] | Representative(s) | Rickard, David John, et al Ipulse 26 Mallinson Road London SW11 1BP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/51] | Rickard, David John, et al Ipulse 26 Mallinson Road London SW11 1BP / GB | ||
Former [2008/44] | Rickard, David John Ipulse 26 Mallinson Road London SW11 1BP / GB | ||
Former [2007/18] | Rickard, David John 26 Mallinson Road London, Greater London SW11 1BP / GB | Application number, filing date | 04737906.0 | 30.06.2004 | [2007/18] | WO2004CA00967 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006002504 | Date: | 12.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1778005 | Date: | 02.05.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1778005 | Date: | 27.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A01K61/00 | [2007/18] | CPC: |
A01K61/54 (EP);
Y02A40/81 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/18] | Title | German: | MUSCHELNETZSCHLÄUCHE | [2007/18] | English: | MUSSEL SOCK | [2007/18] | French: | Boudin de mytiliculture | [2012/41] |
Former [2007/18] | BOUDIN | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.01.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/18] | 09.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.10.2007 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.06.2004 | AT | 27.03.2013 | BE | 27.03.2013 | CY | 27.03.2013 | CZ | 27.03.2013 | DK | 27.03.2013 | EE | 27.03.2013 | FI | 27.03.2013 | MC | 27.03.2013 | PL | 27.03.2013 | RO | 27.03.2013 | SE | 27.03.2013 | SI | 27.03.2013 | SK | 27.03.2013 | TR | 27.03.2013 | BG | 27.06.2013 | CH | 30.06.2013 | LI | 30.06.2013 | LU | 30.06.2013 | PT | 29.07.2013 | DE | 01.01.2014 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CY | 27.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
TR | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2013 | ||
LI | 30.06.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
DE | 01.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CY | 27.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2013 | ||
LI | 30.06.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
DE | 01.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CY | 27.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2013 | ||
LI | 30.06.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CY | 27.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CY | 27.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CY | 27.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | BE | 27.03.2013 | |
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/44] | BE | 27.03.2013 | |
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | FI | 27.03.2013 | |
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | SE | 27.03.2013 | |
BG | 27.06.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR993170 (PLANET HENRI) [A] 1,10* the whole document *; | [Y]FR2521065 (NORTENE SA [FR]) [Y] 17,19 * page 2, lines 37-39 *; | [XY]FR2554319 (LHONNEUR PIERRE [FR]) [X] 1,5,7,9,10,12,13 * page 1, line 26 - page 2, line 11 * * page 2, line 33 - page 3, line 16 * * page 4, line 22 - page 6, line 3 * * page 6, line 33 - page 7, line 5 * * page 9, lines 13-27 * * figures 7,8 * [Y] 2-4,6,8,11,14-20; | [Y]FR2583613 (NORLAC PLASTIQUES [FR]) [Y] 3,15 * page 2, lines 1-4 *; | [Y]FR2636206 (LHONNEUR PIERRE [FR]) [Y] 4,16 * page 6, line 34 - page 7, line 9 *; | [Y]US5511514 (HITCHINS MICHAEL W [NZ], et al) [Y] 18,20 * column 3, lines 40-58 *; | [Y]EP1321371 (INTERMAS NETS SA [ES]) [Y] 2,6,8,11,14 * paragraphs [0012] , [0016] * * figures 1,3 * | by applicant | FR2554319 |