EP1656384 - PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF METHYLALUMINIUM DICHLORIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Givaudan SA Chemin de la Parfumerie 5 1214 Vernier / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2006/20] | For all designated states Givaudan SA Chemin de la Parfumerie 5 1214 Vernier-Genève / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARRAS, Jean-Pierre Rue Chabrey 21 CH-1202 Genève / CH | 02 /
SCHRÖDER, Fridtjof Im Grund 14 CH-8442 Hettlingen / CH | [2006/20] | Representative(s) | Global Patents Givaudan International SA Ueberlandstrasse 138 8600 Dübendorf / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Givaudan Patents Ueberlandstrasse 138 8600 Dubendorf / CH | ||
Former [2006/20] | McStea, John Anthony Givaudan Schweiz AG, Ueberlandstrasse 138 8600 Duebendorf / CH | Application number, filing date | 04738144.7 | 13.08.2004 | [2006/20] | WO2004CH00505 | Priority number, date | GB20030019277 | 18.08.2003 Original published format: GB 0319277 | [2006/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005016938 | Date: | 24.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1656384 | Date: | 17.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1656384 | Date: | 14.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07F5/06 | [2006/20] | CPC: |
C07F5/064 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON METHYLALUMINIUMDICHLORID | [2006/20] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF METHYLALUMINIUM DICHLORIDE | [2006/20] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE DICHLORURE D'METHYLALUMINIUM | [2006/20] | Entry into regional phase | 10.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 10.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/20] | 03.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2008 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.04.2008 | 11.02.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 21.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.04.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.04.2008 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 19.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.10.2009 | BE | 14.10.2009 | CY | 14.10.2009 | CZ | 14.10.2009 | DK | 14.10.2009 | EE | 14.10.2009 | FI | 14.10.2009 | PL | 14.10.2009 | RO | 14.10.2009 | SE | 14.10.2009 | SI | 14.10.2009 | SK | 14.10.2009 | TR | 14.10.2009 | BG | 14.01.2010 | GR | 15.01.2010 | PT | 15.02.2010 | HU | 15.04.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | AT | 14.10.2009 | |
BE | 14.10.2009 | ||
CY | 14.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2009 | ||
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
EE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
PL | 14.10.2009 | ||
RO | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
SK | 14.10.2009 | ||
BG | 14.01.2010 | ||
GR | 15.01.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
HU | 15.04.2010 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 14.10.2009 | |
BE | 14.10.2009 | ||
CY | 14.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2009 | ||
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
EE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
PL | 14.10.2009 | ||
RO | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
SK | 14.10.2009 | ||
BG | 14.01.2010 | ||
GR | 15.01.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 14.10.2009 | |
BE | 14.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2009 | ||
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
EE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
PL | 14.10.2009 | ||
RO | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
SK | 14.10.2009 | ||
BG | 14.01.2010 | ||
GR | 15.01.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/39] | AT | 14.10.2009 | |
BE | 14.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2009 | ||
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
EE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
PL | 14.10.2009 | ||
RO | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
SK | 14.10.2009 | ||
BG | 14.01.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | AT | 14.10.2009 | |
BE | 14.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2009 | ||
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
EE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
PL | 14.10.2009 | ||
RO | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
BG | 14.01.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 14.10.2009 | |
BE | 14.10.2009 | ||
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
EE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
PL | 14.10.2009 | ||
RO | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
BG | 14.01.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/29] | AT | 14.10.2009 | |
BE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
PL | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/23] | FI | 14.10.2009 | |
PL | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/22] | FI | 14.10.2009 | |
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2712546 (HAROLD COATES, et al) [X] 1,2,4 * example 1 *; | [X]US2848472 (COTTLE DELMER L) [X] 1,2,4 * example 1 *; | [DX]US5707961 (BAJGROWICZ JERZY A [CH], et al) [DX] 5-7* column 2, lines 48-53; column 3, lines 8-14 * |