EP1642031 - PUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ixetic Bad Homburg GmbH Georg-Schaeffler-Strasse 3 61352 Bad Homburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/15] | For all designated states ixetic Bad Homburg GmbH Georg-Schaeffler-Strasse 3 61352 Bad Homburg v. d. H. / DE | ||
Former [2006/14] | For all designated states LuK Fahrzeug-Hydraulik GmbH & Co. KG Georg-Schaeffler-Strasse 3 61352 Bad Homburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROSENKRANZ, Kerstin Frankfurter Landstrasse 78 61440 Oberursel / DE | [2006/14] | Representative(s) | Duschl, Edgar Johannes LuK Lamellen und Kupplungsbau Beteiligungs KG Industriestrasse 3 77815 Bühl / DE | [2006/14] | Application number, filing date | 04738773.3 | 24.06.2004 | [2006/14] | WO2004DE01324 | Priority number, date | DE2003129286 | 30.06.2003 Original published format: DE 10329286 | [2006/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005001290 | Date: | 06.01.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1642031 | Date: | 05.04.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.01.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1642031 | Date: | 24.01.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F04C15/00, F16J15/32 | [2006/14] | CPC: |
F04C15/0038 (EP,US);
F04D29/08 (KR);
F04D29/10 (KR);
F16J15/3252 (EP,US);
F16J15/3456 (EP,US);
F04C2/344 (EP,US);
Y10S277/91 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PUMPE | [2006/14] | English: | PUMP | [2006/14] | French: | POMPE | [2006/14] | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/14] | 03.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 24.01.2007 | CZ | 24.01.2007 | DK | 24.01.2007 | EE | 24.01.2007 | FI | 24.01.2007 | IE | 24.01.2007 | NL | 24.01.2007 | PL | 24.01.2007 | RO | 24.01.2007 | SI | 24.01.2007 | SK | 24.01.2007 | TR | 24.01.2007 | BG | 24.04.2007 | SE | 24.04.2007 | GR | 25.04.2007 | ES | 05.05.2007 | AT | 24.06.2007 | LU | 24.06.2007 | PT | 25.06.2007 | BE | 30.06.2007 | MC | 30.06.2007 | HU | 25.07.2007 | [2009/44] |
Former [2009/41] | CY | 24.01.2007 | |
CZ | 24.01.2007 | ||
DK | 24.01.2007 | ||
EE | 24.01.2007 | ||
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
IE | 24.01.2007 | ||
NL | 24.01.2007 | ||
PL | 24.01.2007 | ||
RO | 24.01.2007 | ||
SI | 24.01.2007 | ||
SK | 24.01.2007 | ||
BG | 24.04.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
GR | 25.04.2007 | ||
ES | 05.05.2007 | ||
AT | 24.06.2007 | ||
LU | 24.06.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
BE | 30.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
HU | 25.07.2007 | ||
Former [2009/35] | CY | 24.01.2007 | |
CZ | 24.01.2007 | ||
DK | 24.01.2007 | ||
EE | 24.01.2007 | ||
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
IE | 24.01.2007 | ||
NL | 24.01.2007 | ||
PL | 24.01.2007 | ||
RO | 24.01.2007 | ||
SI | 24.01.2007 | ||
SK | 24.01.2007 | ||
BG | 24.04.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
GR | 25.04.2007 | ||
ES | 05.05.2007 | ||
AT | 24.06.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
BE | 30.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | CZ | 24.01.2007 | |
DK | 24.01.2007 | ||
EE | 24.01.2007 | ||
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
IE | 24.01.2007 | ||
NL | 24.01.2007 | ||
PL | 24.01.2007 | ||
RO | 24.01.2007 | ||
SI | 24.01.2007 | ||
SK | 24.01.2007 | ||
BG | 24.04.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
GR | 25.04.2007 | ||
ES | 05.05.2007 | ||
AT | 24.06.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
BE | 30.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/39] | CZ | 24.01.2007 | |
DK | 24.01.2007 | ||
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
IE | 24.01.2007 | ||
NL | 24.01.2007 | ||
PL | 24.01.2007 | ||
RO | 24.01.2007 | ||
SI | 24.01.2007 | ||
SK | 24.01.2007 | ||
BG | 24.04.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
GR | 25.04.2007 | ||
ES | 05.05.2007 | ||
AT | 24.06.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
BE | 30.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | CZ | 24.01.2007 | |
DK | 24.01.2007 | ||
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
IE | 24.01.2007 | ||
NL | 24.01.2007 | ||
PL | 24.01.2007 | ||
RO | 24.01.2007 | ||
SI | 24.01.2007 | ||
SK | 24.01.2007 | ||
BG | 24.04.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
GR | 25.04.2007 | ||
ES | 05.05.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
BE | 30.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | CZ | 24.01.2007 | |
DK | 24.01.2007 | ||
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
IE | 24.01.2007 | ||
NL | 24.01.2007 | ||
PL | 24.01.2007 | ||
RO | 24.01.2007 | ||
SI | 24.01.2007 | ||
SK | 24.01.2007 | ||
BG | 24.04.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
ES | 05.05.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | CZ | 24.01.2007 | |
DK | 24.01.2007 | ||
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
IE | 24.01.2007 | ||
NL | 24.01.2007 | ||
PL | 24.01.2007 | ||
RO | 24.01.2007 | ||
SI | 24.01.2007 | ||
SK | 24.01.2007 | ||
BG | 24.04.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
ES | 05.05.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/02] | CZ | 24.01.2007 | |
DK | 24.01.2007 | ||
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
IE | 24.01.2007 | ||
NL | 24.01.2007 | ||
PL | 24.01.2007 | ||
SI | 24.01.2007 | ||
SK | 24.01.2007 | ||
BG | 24.04.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
ES | 05.05.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | DK | 24.01.2007 | |
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
IE | 24.01.2007 | ||
NL | 24.01.2007 | ||
PL | 24.01.2007 | ||
SI | 24.01.2007 | ||
SK | 24.01.2007 | ||
BG | 24.04.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
ES | 05.05.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | DK | 24.01.2007 | |
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
NL | 24.01.2007 | ||
PL | 24.01.2007 | ||
SI | 24.01.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
ES | 05.05.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/43] | FI | 24.01.2007 | |
NL | 24.01.2007 | ||
PL | 24.01.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
ES | 05.05.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB1051064 (KIRKLAND D.E.) [A] 1-10* page 2, line 30 - line 40; figures 1,3 *; | [A]DE1253584 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT) [A] 1-10 * column 3, line 40 - column 4, line 56; figure 1 *; | [A]US4050855 (SAKAMAKI HIROSHI, et al) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 11 - line 68; figure 2 *; | [A]US6164928 (AGNER IVO [DE]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * |