EP1626806 - NEW METAL CONTAINING COMPOSITIONS AND THEIR USE AS CATALYST COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.05.2011 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.06.2011 [2011/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Albemarle Netherlands B.V. Barchman Wuytierslaan 10 3818 LH Amersfoort / NL | [2008/35] |
Former [2006/08] | For all designated states Albemarle Netherlands B.V. Stationsplein 4 3818 LE Amersfoort / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JONES, William 56 Lantree Crescent Cambridge CB2 2NJ / GB | 02 /
O'CONNOR, Paul Hogebrinkerweg 9 NL-3871 KM Hoevelaken / NL | 03 /
STAMIRES, Dennis 29 St Michael Dana Point, CA 92629 / US | [2007/13] |
Former [2006/08] | 01 /
JONES, William 56 Lantree Crescent Cambridge CB2 2NJ / GB | ||
02 /
O'CONNOR, Paul Hogebrinkerweg 9 NL-3871 KM Hoevelaken / NL | |||
03 /
STAMIRES, Dennis 3401 Colony Plaza Newport Beach, CA 92660 / US | Representative(s) | Rasser, Jacobus Cornelis, et al Howrey LLP Rembrandt Tower, 31st Floor Amstelplein 1 1096 HA Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Rasser, Jacobus Cornelis, et al Howrey LLP Rembrandt Tower, 31st Floor Amstelplein 1 1096 HA Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [2006/08] | Rasser, Jacobus Cornelis, et al Howrey LLP Rembrandt Tower Amstelplein 1, 31st Floor 1096 HA Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 04739319.4 | 19.05.2004 | [2006/08] | WO2004EP05562 | Priority number, date | US20030472653P | 22.05.2003 Original published format: US 472653 P | EP20030076950 | 24.06.2003 Original published format: EP 03076950 | [2006/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004103553 | Date: | 02.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1626806 | Date: | 22.02.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B01J23/00, B01J23/22, B01J23/847, B01J23/885, B01J37/30, C01B13/14, C01G1/02, B01D53/50, B01D53/56 | [2006/08] | CPC: |
B01D53/508 (EP,US);
B01D53/565 (EP,US);
B01D53/8609 (EP,US);
B01D53/8628 (EP,US);
B01J23/002 (EP,US);
B01J23/007 (EP,US);
B01J23/06 (EP,US);
B01J23/22 (EP,US);
B01J23/30 (EP,US);
B01J23/72 (EP,US);
B01J23/83 (EP,US);
B01J23/8472 (EP,US);
B01J23/885 (EP,US);
B01J29/0308 (EP,US);
B01J29/041 (EP,US);
B01J37/04 (EP,US);
B01J37/30 (EP,US);
C01B13/145 (EP,US);
C01G1/02 (EP,US);
C01G31/00 (EP,US);
C01G39/00 (EP,US);
C01G41/00 (EP,US);
C10G11/182 (EP,US);
C10G2/33 (EP,US);
C10G29/06 (EP,US);
C10G29/16 (EP,US);
C10G45/04 (EP,US);
C10G45/58 (EP,US);
B01D2255/2047 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20723 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20761 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20769 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20776 (EP,US);
B01D2255/9202 (EP,US);
B01D2257/2045 (EP,US);
B01D2257/2064 (EP,US);
B01D2257/406 (EP,US);
B01D2257/408 (EP,US);
B01J2523/00 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/12, B01J2523/27, B01J2523/31, B01J2523/68 (US,EP);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/12, B01J2523/27, B01J2523/31, B01J2523/69 (US,EP);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/17, B01J2523/31, B01J2523/3712, B01J2523/55 (US,EP);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/17, B01J2523/31, B01J2523/68 (EP,US);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/22, B01J2523/31, B01J2523/3712, B01J2523/55 (EP,US);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/27, B01J2523/31, B01J2523/55 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/08] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEUE METALLHALTIGE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND DEREN VERWENDUNG ALS KATALYSATORZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2006/08] | English: | NEW METAL CONTAINING COMPOSITIONS AND THEIR USE AS CATALYST COMPOSITION | [2006/08] | French: | COMPOSITIONS CONTENANT DU METAL ET LEUR UTILISATION EN TANT QUE COMPOSITION CATALYTIQUE | [2006/08] | Entry into regional phase | 04.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/08] | 01.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/25] | 13.01.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2010 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO02064499 (AKZO NOBEL NV [NL]) [X] 1-14 * page 1, line 11 - page 2, line 6 * * page 8, line 6 - page 9, line 2 * * page 11, line 16 - page 13, line 18 *; | [PXL]WO2004018094 (AKZO NOBEL NV [NL]) [PXL] 1-10,12 * (L: priority); page 7, line 10 - page 9, line 28 * * page 13, line 5 - line 30 *; | [EL]WO2004071653 (AKZO NOBEL NV [NL], et al) [EL] 1-14 * (L: priority); page 6, line 25 - line 26 * * page 8, line 27 - line 28; examples 9,14 * * page 8, line 5 - line 9 *; | [X] - YAMANAKA, SHOJI, "Preparation and properties of anion - exchangeable layered basic salts", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (1997), Database accession no. 126:135990, XP002262548 [X] 1-4,7,9 * abstract * | [X] - MORIOKA H ET AL., "Preparation and application of inorganic layered compounds for anion exchanged reaction", RECENT RES. DEVEL. IN MAT. SCI., (1998), vol. 1, pages 137 - 188, XP008024977 [X] 1-9,12 * page 163, column 2 - page 167, column 1 * * see especially p. 165 column 1 - p. 166 column 2 * | [X] - ROJAS R ET AL., "Layered Ni(II)-Zn(II) hydroxyacetates. Anion exchange and thermal decomposition of the hydroxysalts obtained", J. MATER. CHEM., (2002), vol. 12, pages 1071 - 1078, XP008024986 [X] 1-4,7,9 * abstract * * page 1072, column 2, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/b110145e | [A] - NEWMAN S P ET AL, "Comparative Study of Some Layered Hydroxide Salts Containing Exchangeable Interlayer Anions", JOURNAL OF SOLID STATE CHEMISTRY, ORLANDO, FL, US, (1999), vol. 148, ISSN 0022-4596, pages 26 - 40, XP002248953 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/jssc.1999.8330 | [A] - MEYN M ET AL, "ANION-EXCHANGE REACTIONS OF HYDROXY DOUBLE SALTS", INORGANIC CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, EASTON, US, (1993), vol. 32, no. 7, ISSN 0020-1669, pages 1209 - 1215, XP000568280 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ic00059a030 | [DA] - PETROV K ET AL., "Thermal Decomposition of Mixed Magnesium(II)-Cobalt(II) Hydroxide Nitrate Crystals to MgxC03-xO4 Spinels", REACTIVITY OF SOLIDS, (1987), vol. 3, pages 67 - 74, XP008024975 [DA] 1-14 * 'Results' * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0168-7336(87)80018-9 |