EP1636301 - METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF EXPANDING THERMOPLASTIC ELASTOMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.06.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.07.2016 [2016/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/10] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2006/12] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEBERFINGER, Marcus Maalstätte 15 49124 Georgsmarienhütte / DE | 02 /
GÜNTHER, Carsten Venusstrasse 14 49419 Wagenfeld / DE | 03 /
ELING, Berend Vandsburger Weg 45 49448 Lemförde / DE | [2006/12] | Representative(s) | BASF IP Association BASF SE G-FLP-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 04739588.4 | 04.06.2004 | [2006/12] | WO2004EP06034 | Priority number, date | DE2003126138 | 06.06.2003 Original published format: DE 10326138 | [2006/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004108811 | Date: | 16.12.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1636301 | Date: | 22.03.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C08J9/32 | [2006/12] | CPC: |
C08J9/32 (EP,KR,US);
C08G71/04 (KR);
C08L31/00 (KR);
C08L75/04 (KR);
C08G2410/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08J2201/024 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON EXPANDIERBAREN THERMOPLASTISCHEN ELASTOMEREN | [2006/12] | English: | METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF EXPANDING THERMOPLASTIC ELASTOMERS | [2006/12] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION D'ELASTOMERES THERMOPLASTIQUES EXPANSIBLES | [2006/12] | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/12] | 13.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/29] | 15.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/29] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.04.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 01.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2001089594 ; | [XD]EP0692516 (BURGER HANS JOACHIM [DE]) [XD] 12 * column 2, lines 40-58 *; | [X]WO9935327 (MANNINGTON MILLS [US]) [X] 12 * example 4; claim 1 *; | [XD]WO0044821 (HUNTSMAN ICI CHEM LLC [US], et al) [XD] 12 * example 4 *; | [PX]WO03099875 (HUNTSMAN INT LLC [US], et al) [PX] 1-12 * page 13, line 24 - page 14, line 6; example 1 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010803), vol. 2000, no. 21, & JP2001089594 A 20010403 (ACHILLES CORP) [X] 12 * abstract * | Examination | US2005048236 |