EP1759443 - METHOD FOR COVERING AN ELONGATE OBJECT AND DEVICE FOR COVERING SAID ELONGATE OBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Prysmian S.p.A. Viale Sarca 222 20126 Milano / IT | [2008/49] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Prysmain S.p.A. Viale Sarca 222 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2007/10] | For all designated states Prysmian Cavi e Sistemi Energia S.r.l. Viale Sarca 222 20126 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PORTAS, Francesco Pirelli Cavi e Sistemi Energia SpA, Via Serra 3A 15028 Quattordio / IT | 02 /
VALLAURI, Ubaldo Via Sacconi, 4 I-20052 MONZA / IT | [2007/10] | Representative(s) | Bottero, Claudio, et al Porta, Checcacci & Associati S.p.A. Via Trebbia 20 20135 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2007/10] | Bottero, Claudio, et al Porta, Checcacci & Associati S.p.A. Via Trebbia, 20 20135 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 04740378.7 | 25.06.2004 | [2007/10] | WO2004EP06978 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006002650 | Date: | 12.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1759443 | Date: | 07.03.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1759443 | Date: | 27.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H02G15/18 | [2007/10] | CPC: |
H02G15/18 (EP,US);
H02G15/1826 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM UMHÜLLEN EINES LANGGESTRECKTEN GEGENSTANDS UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM UMHÜLLEN DIESES LANGGESTRECKTEN GEGENSTANDS | [2007/10] | English: | METHOD FOR COVERING AN ELONGATE OBJECT AND DEVICE FOR COVERING SAID ELONGATE OBJECT | [2007/10] | French: | PROCEDE DE RECOUVREMENT D'UN OBJET ALLONGE ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE RECOUVRIR LEDIT OBJET ALLONGE | [2007/10] | Entry into regional phase | 27.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 27.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/10] | 18.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 27.08.2008 | CY | 27.08.2008 | CZ | 27.08.2008 | DK | 27.08.2008 | EE | 27.08.2008 | PL | 27.08.2008 | RO | 27.08.2008 | SI | 27.08.2008 | SK | 27.08.2008 | BG | 27.11.2008 | SE | 27.11.2008 | GR | 28.11.2008 | PT | 27.01.2009 | HU | 28.02.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | BE | 27.08.2008 | |
CZ | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
PL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
SE | 27.11.2008 | ||
GR | 28.11.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
HU | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/50] | BE | 27.08.2008 | |
CZ | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
PL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
SE | 27.11.2008 | ||
GR | 28.11.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/24] | BE | 27.08.2008 | |
CZ | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
PL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
SE | 27.11.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | BE | 27.08.2008 | |
CZ | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
SE | 27.11.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | BE | 27.08.2008 | |
CZ | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | BE | 27.08.2008 | |
CZ | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/24] | BE | 27.08.2008 | |
CZ | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | BE | 27.08.2008 | |
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/19] | BE | 27.08.2008 | |
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/17] | SI | 27.08.2008 | Cited in | International search | [AD]US4383131 (CLABBURN ROBIN J T) [AD] 1,18,34-37* the whole document *; | [A]EP0767523 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1,18,34 * abstract *; | [A]FR2756674 (TELECOMMUNICATIONS SA [FR]) [A] 1-6,19-22,31,34 * page 6, line 5 - line 27; figures 3,4 *; | [AD]EP0966780 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [AD] 1-37 * the whole document * |