EP1515832 - METHOD FOR MAKING AN INNER CAVITY IN A SUBSTRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.09.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Micronas GmbH Hans-Bunte-Strasse 19 79108 Freiburg i. Br. / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/12] | For all designated states Micronas GmbH Hans-Bunte-Strasse 19 79108 Freiburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEHMANN, Mirko Sudetenstrasse 4 79117 Freiburg / DE | [2005/12] | Representative(s) | Huwer, Andreas Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Schwaighofstrasse 1 79100 Freiburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Huwer, Andreas Grünwälderstrasse 10-14 79098 Freiburg 1. Br. / DE | ||
Former [2005/12] | Huwer, Andreas Grünwälderstrasse 10-14 D-79098 Freiburg i. Br. / DE | Application number, filing date | 04740456.1 | 30.06.2004 | [2005/12] | WO2004EP07074 | Priority number, date | DE2003131714 | 11.07.2003 Original published format: DE 10331714 | [2005/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005007388 | Date: | 27.01.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1515832 | Date: | 23.03.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1515832 | Date: | 23.11.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B29C55/02, B01L3/00, B81B1/00 | [2005/12] | CPC: |
B29C59/18 (EP,US);
B01L3/508 (EP,US);
B29C70/64 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/12] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM EINBRINGEN EINER INNENHÖHLUNG IN EIN SUBSTRAT | [2005/21] | English: | METHOD FOR MAKING AN INNER CAVITY IN A SUBSTRATE | [2005/12] | French: | PROCEDE POUR FACONNER UNE CAVITE INTERNE DANS UN SUBSTRAT | [2005/12] |
Former [2005/12] | VERFAHREN ZUM EINBRINGEN EINER INNENH HLUNG IN EIN SUBSTRAT | Entry into regional phase | 27.12.2004 | National basic fee paid | 27.12.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.12.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/12] | 03.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/44] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 23.11.2005 | CZ | 23.11.2005 | EE | 23.11.2005 | FI | 23.11.2005 | IE | 23.11.2005 | PL | 23.11.2005 | RO | 23.11.2005 | SI | 23.11.2005 | SK | 23.11.2005 | TR | 23.11.2005 | BG | 23.02.2006 | DK | 23.02.2006 | GR | 23.02.2006 | SE | 23.02.2006 | ES | 06.03.2006 | PT | 24.04.2006 | HU | 24.05.2006 | AT | 30.06.2006 | BE | 30.06.2006 | LU | 30.06.2006 | MC | 30.06.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/37] | CZ | 23.11.2005 | |
EE | 23.11.2005 | ||
FI | 23.11.2005 | ||
IE | 23.11.2005 | ||
PL | 23.11.2005 | ||
RO | 23.11.2005 | ||
SI | 23.11.2005 | ||
SK | 23.11.2005 | ||
TR | 23.11.2005 | ||
BG | 23.02.2006 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
ES | 06.03.2006 | ||
PT | 24.04.2006 | ||
HU | 24.05.2006 | ||
AT | 30.06.2006 | ||
BE | 30.06.2006 | ||
LU | 30.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 23.11.2005 | |
EE | 23.11.2005 | ||
FI | 23.11.2005 | ||
IE | 23.11.2005 | ||
PL | 23.11.2005 | ||
RO | 23.11.2005 | ||
SI | 23.11.2005 | ||
SK | 23.11.2005 | ||
BG | 23.02.2006 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
ES | 06.03.2006 | ||
PT | 24.04.2006 | ||
HU | 24.05.2006 | ||
AT | 30.06.2006 | ||
BE | 30.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/51] | CZ | 23.11.2005 | |
FI | 23.11.2005 | ||
IE | 23.11.2005 | ||
PL | 23.11.2005 | ||
RO | 23.11.2005 | ||
SI | 23.11.2005 | ||
SK | 23.11.2005 | ||
BG | 23.02.2006 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
ES | 06.03.2006 | ||
PT | 24.04.2006 | ||
HU | 24.05.2006 | ||
AT | 30.06.2006 | ||
BE | 30.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | CZ | 23.11.2005 | |
FI | 23.11.2005 | ||
IE | 23.11.2005 | ||
PL | 23.11.2005 | ||
RO | 23.11.2005 | ||
SI | 23.11.2005 | ||
SK | 23.11.2005 | ||
BG | 23.02.2006 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
ES | 06.03.2006 | ||
PT | 24.04.2006 | ||
HU | 24.05.2006 | ||
BE | 30.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/43] | CZ | 23.11.2005 | |
FI | 23.11.2005 | ||
IE | 23.11.2005 | ||
IT | 23.11.2005 | ||
PL | 23.11.2005 | ||
RO | 23.11.2005 | ||
SI | 23.11.2005 | ||
SK | 23.11.2005 | ||
BG | 23.02.2006 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
ES | 06.03.2006 | ||
PT | 24.04.2006 | ||
HU | 24.05.2006 | ||
BE | 30.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/29] | CZ | 23.11.2005 | |
FI | 23.11.2005 | ||
IE | 23.11.2005 | ||
PL | 23.11.2005 | ||
SI | 23.11.2005 | ||
SK | 23.11.2005 | ||
BG | 23.02.2006 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
ES | 06.03.2006 | ||
PT | 24.04.2006 | ||
HU | 24.05.2006 | ||
BE | 30.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/15] | CZ | 23.11.2005 | |
FI | 23.11.2005 | ||
IE | 23.11.2005 | ||
PL | 23.11.2005 | ||
SI | 23.11.2005 | ||
SK | 23.11.2005 | ||
BG | 23.02.2006 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
ES | 06.03.2006 | ||
PT | 24.04.2006 | ||
HU | 24.05.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/07] | CZ | 23.11.2005 | |
FI | 23.11.2005 | ||
IE | 23.11.2005 | ||
SI | 23.11.2005 | ||
SK | 23.11.2005 | ||
BG | 23.02.2006 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
ES | 06.03.2006 | ||
PT | 24.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | CZ | 23.11.2005 | |
FI | 23.11.2005 | ||
IE | 23.11.2005 | ||
SI | 23.11.2005 | ||
SK | 23.11.2005 | ||
BG | 23.02.2006 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
ES | 06.03.2006 | ||
PT | 24.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | CZ | 23.11.2005 | |
FI | 23.11.2005 | ||
IE | 23.11.2005 | ||
SK | 23.11.2005 | ||
BG | 23.02.2006 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
ES | 06.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | CZ | 23.11.2005 | |
FI | 23.11.2005 | ||
SK | 23.11.2005 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
ES | 06.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/35] | CZ | 23.11.2005 | |
FI | 23.11.2005 | ||
SK | 23.11.2005 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
ES | 06.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/33] | FI | 23.11.2005 | |
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
ES | 06.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 23.11.2005 | |
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/24] | FI | 23.11.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]US6000597 (STRAUB MARC ALAN [US], et al) [A] 1-12* abstract *; | [A]US2002001695 (TAJIMA NOBUYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 13 - paragraph 15 *; | [A]US2002017132 (MCNIE MARK E [GB], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0008]; figures 2-8; claims 1,20,23,24 *; | [A]WO02100542 (CENTRE NAT RECH SCIENT [FR], et al) [A] 1-12 * page 1, line 25 - page 2, line 22; figures 1,2a-2e; claims 1-11,14-20 * |