EP1646850 - DOSING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DOSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.08.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.02.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
LI
LU
PL
PT
RO
SE
SK
TR
Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | For:DE
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | [2022/36] |
Former [2021/36] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
GB
GR
HU
LI
LU
PL
PT
RO
SE
SK
TR
Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | ||
For:DE
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | |||
Former [2006/16] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
GB
HU
LI
LU
PL
PT
RO
SE
SK
TR
Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | ||
For:DE
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRICKL, Rolf-Stefan Erlenweg 37 88447 Warthausen / DE | 02 /
SCHRAIVOGEL, Jürgen Trieblesfeld 12 88444 Ummendorf/Fischbach / DE | [2006/16] | Representative(s) | Simon, Elke Anna Maria, et al Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | [2012/40] |
Former [2006/16] | Hammann, Heinz Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | Application number, filing date | 04740689.7 | 06.07.2004 | [2006/16] | WO2004EP07363 | Priority number, date | DE20031031029 | 09.07.2003 Original published format: DE 10331029 | [2006/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005005936 | Date: | 20.01.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1646850 | Date: | 19.04.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1646850 | Date: | 08.09.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/36] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1646850 | Date: | 14.09.2022 | [2022/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01F11/10, G01F11/00, B65D83/06, G01F11/18 | [2006/16] | CPC: |
B65D83/06 (EP,US);
G01F11/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, LI, LU, PL, PT, RO, SE, SK, TR [2022/36] |
Former [2021/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, LI, LU, PL, PT, RO, SE, SK, TR | ||
Former [2006/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | DOSIERVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR DOSIERUNG | [2006/16] | English: | DOSING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DOSING | [2006/16] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE DOSAGE | [2006/16] | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/16] | 04.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.05.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 10.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.05.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 03.08.2022 | Request for correction of the decision to grant filed | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.10.2011 | Opposition(s) | 09.06.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/33] | 09.06.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/36] | 09.06.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/37] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 10.07.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 10.07.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.07.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 01.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 31.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 31.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 31.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 31.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 02.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 18 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.07.2004 | CY | 08.09.2021 | CZ | 08.09.2021 | DK | 08.09.2021 | EE | 08.09.2021 | ES | 08.09.2021 | FI | 08.09.2021 | PL | 08.09.2021 | RO | 08.09.2021 | SE | 08.09.2021 | SK | 08.09.2021 | TR | 08.09.2021 | BG | 08.12.2021 | GR | 09.12.2021 | PT | 10.01.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/20] | HU | 06.07.2004 | |
CY | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 06.07.2004 | |
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | CZ | 08.09.2021 | |
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | CZ | 08.09.2021 | |
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | CZ | 08.09.2021 | |
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/12] | ES | 08.09.2021 | |
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | ES | 08.09.2021 | |
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE9309294U (GIEHL JOACHIM [DE]) [A] 12,13,18 * page 6, line 29 - line 36 ** figure 3 *; | [X]DE9309686U (LANG CHRISTOPH [DE]) [X] 1,2,7,10 * figure 2 * * page 4, line 4 - line 16 *; | [XA]DE29515145U (KUELLGENS SIMONE [DE]) [X] 1 * page 2, line 8 - line 10 * * figures 2-4 * [A] 6,8; | [X]WO0037897 (HOECHST SCHERING AGREVO GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7,9-11,14-17 * abstract * * page 1, line 19 - line 25 * * page 3, line 21 * * page 3, line 27 - line 30 * * page 4, line 4 - line 6 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US2003071070 (JOUVE DELPHINE [FR]) [A] 3,6,7,10 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 15 - paragraph 16 * * page 4, paragraph 70 * |