EP1644429 - FLUORINE-MODIFIED POLYURETHANE RESINS CONTAINING ONE OR TWO CONSTITUENTS, METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF, AND USE OF THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.06.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.08.2012 [2012/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Construction Research & Technology GmbH Dr.-Albert-Frank-Str. 32 83308 Trostberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/15] | For all designated states Construction Research & Technology GmbH Dr.Albert-Frank-Strasse 32 83308 Trostberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAIER, Alois Ahornstrasse 5 84549 Engelsberg / DE | 02 /
STEIDL, Norbert Am Laberinger Feld 9 83361 Kienberg / DE | 03 /
INGRISCH, Stefan Wehrländerstrasse 27a 83376 Truchtlaching / DE | 04 /
WEINELT, Frank Ortlehnerstr. 22 84508 Burgkirchen / DE | [2006/15] | Representative(s) | Böhm, Brigitte Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/15] | Böhm, Brigitte Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04740711.9 | 06.07.2004 | [2006/15] | WO2004EP07391 | Priority number, date | DE2003131483 | 11.07.2003 Original published format: DE 10331483 | [2006/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005007722 | Date: | 27.01.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1644429 | Date: | 12.04.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/28, C09D175/04, C08G18/32, C08G18/38, C08G18/62, C08G18/71 | [2006/15] | CPC: |
C08G18/6225 (EP,US);
C08G18/2885 (EP,US);
C08G18/3275 (EP,US);
C08G18/3812 (EP,US);
C08G18/718 (EP,US);
C09D175/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLUORMODIFIZIERTE EIN- ODER ZWEIKOMPONENTIGE POLYURETHANHARZE, VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND DEREN VERWENDUNG | [2006/15] | English: | FLUORINE-MODIFIED POLYURETHANE RESINS CONTAINING ONE OR TWO CONSTITUENTS, METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF, AND USE OF THE SAME | [2006/15] | French: | RESINES DE POLYURETHANNE MODIFIEES AU FLUOR A UN OU DEUX CONSTITUANTS, LEUR PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION ET LEUR UTILISATION | [2006/15] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.02.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/15] | 17.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/31] | 08.03.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.12.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2011 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]EP0405534 (SYREMONT SPA [IT]) [AD] 1-29 * page 2, line 14 - page 4, line 25 * * examples 1,6 *; | [DA]WO9736951 (GORE & ASS [US]) [DA] 1-29* example 1 *; | [A]WO0125320 (DU PONT [US]) [A] 1-29 * example 3 *; | [A]EP1136278 (DAINICHISEIKA COLOR CHEM [JP], et al) [A] 1-3,8,21-23 * page 13, line 15 - line 40 * * example 1; table 1 * |