EP1641888 - AMINO ACID DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE AS A SAG CONTROL AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, PT | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nuplex Resins B.V. Synthesebaan 1 4612 RB Bergen op Zoom / NL | [2006/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRINKHUIS, Richard, Hendrikus, Gerrit Groot Wezenland 33 NL-8011 JX Zwolle / NL | 02 /
VENDERBOSCH, Rudolf, Anthonius, Maria Klavecimbelstraat 6 NL-6922 JL Duiven / NL | [2006/14] | Representative(s) | Derks, Wilbert, et al Hoyng Rokh Monegier LLP Rembrandt Tower, 31st Floor Amstelplein 1 1096 HA Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2012/05] | Derks, Wilbert, et al Hoyng Monegier LLP Rembrandt Tower, 31st Floor Amstelplein 1 1096 HA Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [2006/14] | Derks, Wilbert Howrey, Simon, Arnold & White LLP Rembrandt Tower, 31st floor Amstelplein 1 1096 HA Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 04740880.2 | 08.07.2004 | [2006/14] | WO2004EP07602 | Priority number, date | EP20030077152 | 08.07.2003 Original published format: EP 03077152 | EP20040075341 | 03.02.2004 Original published format: EP 04075341 | US20040543387P | 11.02.2004 Original published format: US 543387 P | [2006/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005005558 | Date: | 20.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1641888 | Date: | 05.04.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1641888 | Date: | 29.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C09D5/04, C08G18/80 | [2006/14] | CPC: |
C08G18/4063 (EP,US);
C08G18/8054 (EP,US);
C09D175/04 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C09D175/04, C08L2666/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/14] | Title | German: | AMINOSÄUREDERIVATE UND DEREN VERWENDUNG ALS BIEGUNGSKONTROLLMITTEL | [2006/14] | English: | AMINO ACID DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE AS A SAG CONTROL AGENT | [2006/14] | French: | DERIVES D'ACIDES AMINES ET LEUR UTILISATION EN TANT QU'AGENT DE CONTROLE DE COULURE | [2006/14] | Entry into regional phase | 17.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 08.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/14] | 06.03.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 17.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.02.2010 | Opposition(s) | 30.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.05.2006 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   08.05.2006 | 08.05.2006 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   08.05.2006 | 08.05.2006 | BG   M01   Fee paid on   08.05.2006 | 08.05.2006 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   08.05.2006 | 08.05.2006 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   08.05.2006 | 08.05.2006 | CZ   M01   Fee paid on   08.05.2006 | 08.05.2006 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   08.05.2006 | 08.05.2006 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   08.05.2006 | 08.05.2006 | EE   M01   Fee paid on   08.05.2006 | 08.05.2006 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   08.05.2006 | 08.05.2006 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   08.05.2006 | 08.05.2006 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   08.05.2006 | 08.05.2006 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   08.05.2006 | 08.05.2006 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   08.05.2006 | 08.05.2006 | HU   M01   Fee paid on   08.05.2006 | 08.05.2006 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   08.05.2006 | 08.05.2006 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   08.05.2006 | 08.05.2006 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   08.05.2006 | 08.05.2006 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   08.05.2006 | 08.05.2006 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   08.05.2006 | 08.05.2006 | PL   M01   Fee paid on   08.05.2006 | 08.05.2006 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   08.05.2006 | 08.05.2006 | RO   M01   Fee paid on   08.05.2006 | 08.05.2006 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   08.05.2006 | 08.05.2006 | SI   M01   Fee paid on   08.05.2006 | 08.05.2006 | SK   M01   Fee paid on   08.05.2006 | 08.05.2006 | TR   M01   Fee paid on   08.05.2006 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2006 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.08.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | Date: | 05.10.2006 | [2006/48] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.07.2004 | CY | 29.02.2012 | DK | 29.02.2012 | EE | 29.02.2012 | FI | 29.02.2012 | PT | 29.02.2012 | RO | 29.02.2012 | SE | 29.02.2012 | SK | 29.02.2012 | TR | 29.02.2012 | BG | 29.05.2012 | GR | 30.05.2012 | IE | 08.07.2012 | LU | 08.07.2012 | CH | 31.07.2012 | LI | 31.07.2012 | MC | 31.07.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
TR | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IE | 08.07.2012 | ||
LU | 08.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
TR | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IE | 08.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IE | 08.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 29.02.2012 | |
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | GR | 30.05.2012 | Cited in | International search | [DA]JP2003183583 ; | [DA]US4311622 (BUTER ROELOF) [DA] 1,12,13 * claim 1 *; | [DA]US2002082324 (VAN HEUGTEN RICHARD GERARDUS J [NL], et al) [DA] 1,13 * claims 1,6 * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031105), vol. 2003, no. 11, & JP2003183583 A 20030703 (KUSUMOTO KASEI KK) [DA] 1,13 * abstract * |