EP1658421 - ROLLER SEAM WELDED BODY FOR EXHAUST TREATMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.02.2009 [2009/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Emitec Gesellschaft für Emissionstechnologie mbH Hauptstrasse 150 53797 Lohmar / DE | [2006/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIRTH, Peter Birkenweg 56 51503 Rösrath / DE | 02 /
BRÜCK, Rolf Fröbelstrasse 12 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | 03 /
HÄRIG, Thomas Rathausstrasse 14 53819 Neunkirchen-Seelscheid / DE | [2007/04] |
Former [2006/21] | 01 /
HIRTH, Peter Forststrasse 10 51107 Köln / DE | ||
02 /
BRÜCK, Rolf Fröbelstrasse 12 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | |||
03 /
HÄRIG, Thomas Rathausstrasse 14 53819 Neunkirchen-Seelscheid / DE | Representative(s) | Kahlhöfer, Hermann, et al KNH Patentanwälte Kahlhöfer Neumann Rössler Heine PartG mbB Postfach 10 33 63 40024 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/21] | Kahlhöfer, Hermann, et al Patentanwälte Kahlhöfer Neumann Herzog Fiesser Karlstrasse 76 40210 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 04741334.9 | 30.07.2004 | [2006/21] | WO2004EP08560 | Priority number, date | DE2003137265 | 13.08.2003 Original published format: DE 10337265 | [2006/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005019617 | Date: | 03.03.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1658421 | Date: | 24.05.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1658421 | Date: | 12.03.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/28, B01J35/04, B23K11/00 | [2006/21] | CPC: |
F01N13/1838 (EP,US);
B01J35/56 (EP,US);
B23K11/0026 (EP,US);
B23K11/06 (EP,US);
B23K11/065 (EP,US);
B23K2101/006 (EP,US);
B23K2101/04 (EP,US);
F01N2330/02 (EP,US);
F01N2330/04 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, PL [2006/47] |
Former [2006/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ROLLNAHTGESCHWEISSTER KÖRPER ZUR ABGASBEHANDLUNG | [2006/21] | English: | ROLLER SEAM WELDED BODY FOR EXHAUST TREATMENT | [2006/21] | French: | CORPS SOUDE A LA MOLETTE DESTINE AU TRAITEMENT DE GAZ D'ECHAPPEMENT | [2006/21] | Entry into regional phase | 10.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 10.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/21] | 12.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH02131142 ; | [A]JPH01242153 ; | [A]US4316823 (BOZON ALFRED, et al) [A] 1,9* column 2, line 32 - column 2, line 62 *; | [XA]GB2139131 (BEKAERT SA NV) [X] 1-3,19 * column 3, line 43 - column 3, line 63; figure 4a * [A] 8; | GB2139131 [ ] (BEKAERT SA NV); | [A]EP0665367 (SCHWAEBISCHE HUETTENWERKE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,9 * claims 1-7 *; | [X]DE4411302 (DEGUSSA [DE]) [X] 1-3,19 * column 2, line 44 - column 2, line 55 * * column 3, line 46 - column 3, line 52 *; | [A]EP1230978 (KEMIRA METALKAT OY [FI]) [A] 1,9 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900802), vol. 0143, no. 56, Database accession no. (C - 0745), & JP2131142 A 19900518 (USUI INTERNATL IND CO LTD) [A] 1,9 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891220), vol. 0135, no. 79, Database accession no. (C - 668), & JP1242153 A 19890927 (CALSONIC CORP) [A] 1,9 * abstract * |