EP1751928 - LOSSLESS RADIO LINK CONTROL ENTITY (RLC) RE-ESTABLISHMENT AVOIDING SERVICE DATA UNIT (SDU) DUPLICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.01.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/09] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2007/07] | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TORSNER, Johan Skogstorpsvägen 2C9 FIN-02 430 Masaby / FI | [2007/07] | Representative(s) | Hasselgren, Erik Joakim Ericsson AB Patent Unit LTE Torshamnsgatan 23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/14] | Hasselgren, Erik Joakim Ericsson AB Patent Unit LTE Torshamnsgatan 23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2007/07] | Hagmann-Smith, Martin P. Marks & Clerk, 4220 Nash Court, Oxford Business Park South Oxford Oxfordshire OX4 2RU / GB | Application number, filing date | 04741531.0 | 07.05.2004 | [2007/07] | WO2004EP50737 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005109778 | Date: | 17.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1751928 | Date: | 14.02.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1751928 | Date: | 02.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/56, H04L1/18 | [2007/07] | CPC: |
H04L1/1832 (EP,US);
H04L1/187 (EP,US);
H04W76/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUFBAU EINER VERLUSTLOSEN FUNKSTRECKENSTEUERENTITÄT (RLC) UNTER VERMEIDUNG EINER DUPLIKATION DER DIENSTDATENEINHEIT (SDU) | [2007/07] | English: | LOSSLESS RADIO LINK CONTROL ENTITY (RLC) RE-ESTABLISHMENT AVOIDING SERVICE DATA UNIT (SDU) DUPLICATION | [2007/07] | French: | RE-ETABLISSEMENT D'ENTITE DE COMMANDE DE LIAISON RADIO (RLC) SANS PERTE EVITANT LA DUPLICATION D'UNITE DE DONNEES DE SERVICE (SDU) | [2007/07] | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/07] | 28.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 29.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.03.2011 | BE | 02.03.2011 | CY | 02.03.2011 | CZ | 02.03.2011 | DK | 02.03.2011 | EE | 02.03.2011 | FI | 02.03.2011 | HU | 02.03.2011 | IT | 02.03.2011 | PL | 02.03.2011 | RO | 02.03.2011 | SE | 02.03.2011 | SI | 02.03.2011 | SK | 02.03.2011 | TR | 02.03.2011 | IE | 07.05.2011 | LU | 07.05.2011 | CH | 31.05.2011 | FR | 31.05.2011 | LI | 31.05.2011 | MC | 31.05.2011 | BG | 02.06.2011 | GR | 03.06.2011 | ES | 13.06.2011 | PT | 04.07.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
BE | 02.03.2011 | ||
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2011 | ||
DK | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
IT | 02.03.2011 | ||
PL | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
TR | 02.03.2011 | ||
IE | 07.05.2011 | ||
LU | 07.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
FR | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
BE | 02.03.2011 | ||
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2011 | ||
DK | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
IT | 02.03.2011 | ||
PL | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
IE | 07.05.2011 | ||
LU | 07.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
FR | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
BE | 02.03.2011 | ||
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2011 | ||
DK | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
IT | 02.03.2011 | ||
PL | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
IE | 07.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
FR | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/22] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
BE | 02.03.2011 | ||
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2011 | ||
DK | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
PL | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
IE | 07.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
FR | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
BE | 02.03.2011 | ||
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2011 | ||
DK | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
PL | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
IE | 07.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
BE | 02.03.2011 | ||
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2011 | ||
DK | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
PL | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
BE | 02.03.2011 | ||
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2011 | ||
DK | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/07] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
BE | 02.03.2011 | ||
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
BE | 02.03.2011 | ||
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/51] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
BE | 02.03.2011 | ||
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
BE | 02.03.2011 | ||
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
BE | 02.03.2011 | ||
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/41] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
BE | 02.03.2011 | ||
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/39] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 02.03.2011 | |
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | SE | 02.03.2011 | |
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1056258 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1,3-6,8,10,12-16,18,20,21,23-26,28,30,32-36,38,40 * paragraphs [0013] , [0025] , [0027] * * paragraphs [0030] , [0031] , [0035] * * paragraphs [0037] , [0042] - [0044] * * paragraphs [0048] , [0050] * * claims 3,4,13,25 *; | [A] - "Universal Mobile Telecommunications System (UMTS); Radio Link Control (RLC) protocol specification (3GPP TS 25.322 version 5.7.0 Release 5); ETSI TS 125 322", ETSI STANDARDS, EUROPEAN TELECOMMUNICATIONS STANDARDS INSTITUTE, SOPHIA-ANTIPO, FR, (200312), no. V570, ISSN 0000-0001, pages 0 - 79, XP002313673 [A] 1-40 * page 15, paragraph 4.2.1.3.1 - page 16, paragraph 4.2.1.3.1 * * page 17, paragraph 6 * * page 21, paragraphs 8.2-4 * * page 22, paragraphs 8.2-7 * * page 52, paragraph 9.7.7 * | [T] - ERICSSON, QUALCOMM EUROPE, "RLC size handling and RLC re-establishment, 25.322, V 5.7.0 ,v570, CR 257,3GPP TSG-RAN2 MEETING 42", 3GPP TSG-RAN2 MEETING 42, MONTREAL, CANANDA, (20040510), pages 1 - 10, XP002313674 [T] 1-40 * the whole document * |