EP1638718 - PULVER METALLURGICAL COMPONENT PRODUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.07.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.08.2011 [2011/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Metso Powdermet Oy P.O. Box 1000 33101 Tampere / FI | [2006/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIIMATAINEN, Jari, Ilmari Villilänniemi 10 B FI-33300 Tampere / FI | [2006/13] | Representative(s) | Langenskiöld, Tord Karl Walter Oy Jalo Ant-Wuorinen Ab Iso-Roobertinkatu 4-6 A 00120 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2006/13] | Langenskiöld, Tord Karl Walter Oy Jalo Ant-Wuorinen Ab, Iso-Roobertinkatu 4-6 A 00120 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 04742151.6 | 30.06.2004 | [2006/13] | WO2004FI00408 | Priority number, date | FI20030000980 | 30.06.2003 Original published format: FI 20030980 | [2006/13] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005000504 | Date: | 06.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1638718 | Date: | 29.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.01.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 06.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B22F5/10, B22F7/00, B22F7/06, B22F7/08 | [2006/13] | CPC: |
B22F5/10 (EP);
B22F2999/00 (EP);
B23K35/001 (EP);
C21D2241/02 (EP)
| C-Set: |
B22F2999/00, B22F3/15, B22F5/10, B22F7/062 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG VON BAUTEILEN DURCH PULVERMETALLURGIE | [2006/13] | English: | PULVER METALLURGICAL COMPONENT PRODUCTION | [2006/13] | French: | PRODUCTION D'UN COMPOSE METALLURGIQUE EN POUDRE | [2006/13] | Entry into regional phase | 02.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.01.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 02.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/13] | 15.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2009 | Invitation to provide information on prior art | 29.10.2009 | Reply to the invitation to provide information on prior art | 22.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/34] | 05.04.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/34] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.11.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB1414413 (CONTOUR SAWS); | [X]US4537097 (ILLERHAUS ROLAND [SG], et al); | [X]US4627958 (HAYS CHARLES [US]); | [A]US4748059 (BROSIUS KARL S [US], et al); | [A]US4933141 (MANKINS WILLIAM L [US], et al); | [P]EP1354653 (DELPHI TECH INC [US]) | by applicant | GB1414413 |