EP1654416 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR SEPARATING MATERIAL FLOWS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Metso Paper, Inc. Fabianinkatu 9 A 00130 Helsinki / FI | [2006/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAMMINEN, Perttu Kallliokuja 6 AS. 4 FI-24800 Halikko / FI | [2007/04] |
Former [2006/19] | 01 /
LAMMINEN, Perttu Huhdintie 12 as. 1 FI-31700 Urjala / FI | Representative(s) | Lorenz, Werner Lorenz & Kollegen Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Alte Ulmer Strasse 2 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/19] | Lorenz, Werner Lorenz & Kollegen Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alte Ulmer Strasse 2-4 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 04742265.4 | 11.08.2004 | [2006/19] | WO2004FI50116 | Priority number, date | FI20030001159 | 15.08.2003 Original published format: FI 20031159 | [2006/19] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005017253 | Date: | 24.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1654416 | Date: | 10.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1654416 | Date: | 14.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 24.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | D21D5/00, D21D5/26 | [2006/19] | CPC: |
D21D5/00 (EP);
D21F1/66 (EP);
D21F1/70 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR TRENNUNG VON MATERIALSTRÖMEN | [2006/19] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR SEPARATING MATERIAL FLOWS | [2006/19] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE SEPARATION DE FLUX DE MATIERES | [2006/19] | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/19] | 31.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2006 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   11.01.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 14.11.2007 | CH | 14.11.2007 | CY | 14.11.2007 | CZ | 14.11.2007 | DK | 14.11.2007 | EE | 14.11.2007 | FI | 14.11.2007 | LI | 14.11.2007 | NL | 14.11.2007 | PL | 14.11.2007 | RO | 14.11.2007 | SI | 14.11.2007 | SK | 14.11.2007 | TR | 14.11.2007 | BG | 14.02.2008 | SE | 14.02.2008 | GR | 15.02.2008 | ES | 25.02.2008 | PT | 14.04.2008 | HU | 15.05.2008 | GB | 11.08.2008 | IE | 11.08.2008 | LU | 11.08.2008 | [2010/38] |
Former [2010/34] | BE | 14.11.2007 | |
CH | 14.11.2007 | ||
CY | 14.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2007 | ||
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
EE | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
LI | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
PL | 14.11.2007 | ||
RO | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
GR | 15.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
HU | 15.05.2008 | ||
GB | 11.08.2008 | ||
IE | 11.08.2008 | ||
LU | 11.08.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | BE | 14.11.2007 | |
CH | 14.11.2007 | ||
CY | 14.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2007 | ||
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
EE | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
LI | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
PL | 14.11.2007 | ||
RO | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
GR | 15.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
GB | 11.08.2008 | ||
IE | 11.08.2008 | ||
LU | 11.08.2008 | ||
Former [2010/01] | BE | 14.11.2007 | |
CH | 14.11.2007 | ||
CY | 14.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2007 | ||
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
EE | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
LI | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
PL | 14.11.2007 | ||
RO | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
GR | 15.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
GB | 11.08.2008 | ||
IE | 11.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | BE | 14.11.2007 | |
CH | 14.11.2007 | ||
CY | 14.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2007 | ||
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
EE | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
LI | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
PL | 14.11.2007 | ||
RO | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
GR | 15.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
IE | 11.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | BE | 14.11.2007 | |
CH | 14.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2007 | ||
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
EE | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
LI | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
PL | 14.11.2007 | ||
RO | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
GR | 15.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | BE | 14.11.2007 | |
CH | 14.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2007 | ||
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
LI | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
PL | 14.11.2007 | ||
RO | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
GR | 15.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | BE | 14.11.2007 | |
CH | 14.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2007 | ||
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
LI | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
PL | 14.11.2007 | ||
RO | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | BE | 14.11.2007 | |
CH | 14.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2007 | ||
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
LI | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
PL | 14.11.2007 | ||
RO | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | CH | 14.11.2007 | |
CZ | 14.11.2007 | ||
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
LI | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
PL | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | CH | 14.11.2007 | |
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
LI | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
PL | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | CH | 14.11.2007 | |
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
LI | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
PL | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4435196 (PIELKENROOD JACOB [NL]); | [A]US5084161 (VIKIOE PENTTI A [FI]); | [A]US5308384 (KAPANEN KARI [FI], et al) |