EP1620336 - DEVICE FOR THE ELASTIC APPLICATION OF A SCRAPER BLADE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 12.03.2008 [2008/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE FINANCIERE DE GESTION 139-141 rue du Luxembourg 59100 Roubaix / FR | [2006/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIMOENS, Hervé 40, avenue Foch F-59700 Marcq-en-Baroeul / FR | [2006/05] | Representative(s) | Tournel, Jean Louis Cabinet David Tournel 12, rue d'Orleans 44000 Nantes / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/05] | Tournel, Jean Louis Cabinet David Tournel 12, rue d'Orleans 44000 Nantes / FR | Application number, filing date | 04742354.6 | 24.03.2004 | [2006/05] | WO2004FR00748 | Priority number, date | FR20030004915 | 22.04.2003 Original published format: FR 0304915 | [2006/05] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004094278 | Date: | 04.11.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1620336 | Date: | 01.02.2006 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1620336 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B65G45/16 | [2006/05] | CPC: |
B65G45/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ELASTISCHEN ANWENDUNG EINER ABSTREIFKLINGE | [2006/05] | English: | DEVICE FOR THE ELASTIC APPLICATION OF A SCRAPER BLADE | [2006/05] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'APPLICATION ELASTIQUE D'UNE LAME DE RACLEUR | [2006/05] | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 07.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/05] | 23.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 16.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | PL | 02.11.2006 | MC | 31.03.2007 | [2008/11] |
Former [2007/29] | PL | 02.11.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3402407 (KILLE HEINZ [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]GB2165200 (BUSH ANTHONY) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]US4838409 (RAPPEN ALBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 38 - column 5, line 19; figures 1-9 *; | [A]DE3908873 (RUHRKOHLE AG [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]US6279727 (WAALKES JON ROBERT [US], et al) [A] 1* figures 1,2A-2C * |