EP1613999 - RETROPROJECTION SCREEN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.07.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.08.2007 [2007/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Synelec Telecom Multimedia Zone Industrielle 12380 Saint-Sernin-sur-Rance / FR | [2006/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GIBILIN, Daniel 2120, route du Bouloud F-38410 Saint Martin D'uriage / FR | [2006/02] | Representative(s) | Hirsch & Associés 154 Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/02] | Hirsch & Associés 58, avenue Marceau 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 04742433.8 | 02.04.2004 | [2006/02] | WO2004FR00839 | Priority number, date | FR20030004125 | 02.04.2003 Original published format: FR 0304125 | [2006/02] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004090631 | Date: | 21.10.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1613999 | Date: | 11.01.2006 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G03B21/62 | [2006/02] | CPC: |
G03B21/625 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RÜCKPROJEKTIONSSCHIRM | [2006/02] | English: | RETROPROJECTION SCREEN | [2006/02] | French: | ECRAN DE RETROPROJECTION | [2006/02] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/02] | 04.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/34] | 03.04.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2007/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2007 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2928131 (JOSEPH MAHLER) [Y] 5,6 * column 2, line 48 - line 69 * * column 6, line 37 - line 45 * * figures 2-7,9-13 *; | [XY]US4432010 (OGUINO MASANORI [JP]) [X] 1-4,8-10,14,16-19,21,22,25,26 * column 1, line 10 - line 61 * * column 3, line 50 - line 63 * * column 4, line 55 - line 57 * * column 12, line 20 - line 32 * * figures 1-4,6,9,18 * [Y] 5-7,11-13,20,23,24; | [A]US4566756 (HEIJNEMANS WERNER A L [NL]) [A] * column 5, line 20 - column 7, line 37; figures 1-8 *; | [Y]EP0752613 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 20,23,24 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0775935 (NASHUA CORP [US], et al) [Y] 5,6 * page 2, line 1 - line 7 * * page 2, line 44 - page 3, line 8 *; | [Y]US5889612 (VAN DE VEN JOHANNES C [NL]) [Y] 7,11-13 * column 6, line 48 - column 7, line 4; figure 2 *; | [A]US2001050811 (MIYATA HIDEKI [JP]) [A] 16 * abstract * |