EP1740326 - ROTARY CASING ROLL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.07.2010 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VAI CLECIM 51, rue Sibert 42400 Saint-Chamond / FR | [2007/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FAURE, Jean-Paul 6, Les Rayes Vertes F-95610 Eragny/Oise / FR | 02 /
PARACUELLOS, Eric 4 rue de la Plagne F-42600 Montbrison / FR | 03 /
WANG, Xiao, Room 129 402 Baoshan No. 10 Village, Baoshan District Shangai 201900 / CN | 04 /
CHEN, Shouqun, Room 18 802 Lane No. 1683, Zhoujiazhui Road Shangai 200092 / CN | [2007/02] | Representative(s) | Fischer, Michael, et al Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/23] | Fischer, Michael, et al Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/02] | Michelet, Alain, et al Cabinet Harlé et Phélip 7, rue de Madrid 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 04742534.3 | 16.04.2004 | [2007/02] | WO2004FR00954 | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005110635 | Date: | 24.11.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1740326 | Date: | 10.01.2007 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B21B13/14, D21G1/02 | [2007/02] | CPC: |
F16C13/028 (EP,US);
B21B27/055 (EP,US);
D21G1/022 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DREHMANTELZYLINDER | [2007/02] | English: | ROTARY CASING ROLL | [2007/02] | French: | CYLINDRE A ENVELOPPE TOURNANTE | [2007/02] | Entry into regional phase | 16.11.2006 | National basic fee paid | 16.11.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.11.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/02] | 08.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/34] | 06.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2010/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2010 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XD]GB2060822 (KLEINEWEFERS GMBH) [XD] 1-19 * figures 1,6,7,10 *; | [A]DE3700439 (ESCHER WYSS AG [CH]) [A] 1-19* figures 1,4,4A,6 *; | [A]US4882922 (DOMINIQUE BOULOT [FR]) [A] 1-19 * figures 2,3 *; | [X]EP0536501 (VOITH GMBH J M [DE]) [X] 1-19 * figures 1,2 * |