EP1620577 - CONTROL OR MODELING OF A METHOD FOR CHEMICAL INFILTRATION IN A VAPOR PHASE FOR THE DENSIFICATION OF POROUS SUBSTRATES BY CARBON [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MESSIER-BUGATTI Zone Aéronautique Louis Bréguet 78140 Vélizy Villacoublay / FR | [2011/34] |
Former [2006/05] | For all designated states MESSIER-BUGATTI Zone Aéronautique Louis Bréguet 78140 Velizy Villacoublay / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SION, Eric 81 rue du Marechal Foch F-67380 Lingolsheim / FR | 02 /
MARQUAIRE, Paul-Marie 41 rue de la Croix Gagnée F-54000 NANCY / FR | 03 /
FOURNET, René 29 rue des Bouleaux F-54270 ESSEY LES NANCY / FR | 04 /
COME, Guy-Marie 9 rue Churchill F-54000 NANCY / FR | [2007/37] |
Former [2006/05] | 01 /
SION, Eric 5A Impasse de l'Hôpital F-67190 MUTZIG / FR | ||
02 /
MARQUAIRE, Paul-Marie 41 rue de la Croix Gagnée F-54000 NANCY / FR | |||
03 /
FOURNET, René 29 rue des Bouleaux F-54270 ESSEY LES NANCY / FR | |||
04 /
COME, Guy-Marie 9 rue Churchill F-54000 NANCY / FR | Representative(s) | Joly, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/05] | Joly, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 04742576.4 | 27.04.2004 | [2006/05] | WO2004FR01009 | Priority number, date | FR20030005194 | 28.04.2003 Original published format: FR 0305194 | [2006/05] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004097065 | Date: | 11.11.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1620577 | Date: | 01.02.2006 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1620577 | Date: | 24.08.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/26, C23C16/44, C04B35/83, G05B1/00 | [2006/05] | CPC: |
C23C16/4412 (EP,US);
C23C16/26 (EP,KR,US);
C04B35/83 (KR);
C23C16/045 (EP,US);
C23C16/44 (KR);
C23C16/52 (EP,US);
G05B1/00 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERUNG ODER MODELIERUNG VON VERFAHREN ZUR VERDICHTUNG VON PORÖSEN SUBSTRATEN MIT KOHLENSTOFF MITTELS CHEMISCHEN GASPHASENINFILTRATION | [2006/05] | English: | CONTROL OR MODELING OF A METHOD FOR CHEMICAL INFILTRATION IN A VAPOR PHASE FOR THE DENSIFICATION OF POROUS SUBSTRATES BY CARBON | [2006/05] | French: | COMMANDE OU MODELISATION DE PROCEDE D'INFILTRATION CHIMIQUE EN PHASE VAPEUR POUR LA DENSIFICATION DE SUBSTRATS POREUX PAR DU CARBONE. | [2006/05] | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/05] | 03.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.03.2008 | Opposition(s) | 25.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Licence(s) | ID: | 01 01/exclusive | For: | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | Licencee: | Snecma Propulsion Solid Le Haillan, Les cinq Chemins 33187 Le Haillan Cedex / FR | Date: | 13.06.2006 | [2006/36] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.04.2004 | CY | 24.08.2011 | CZ | 24.08.2011 | DK | 24.08.2011 | EE | 24.08.2011 | FI | 24.08.2011 | IE | 24.08.2011 | IT | 24.08.2011 | NL | 24.08.2011 | PL | 24.08.2011 | RO | 24.08.2011 | SE | 24.08.2011 | SI | 24.08.2011 | SK | 24.08.2011 | TR | 24.08.2011 | BG | 24.11.2011 | GR | 25.11.2011 | ES | 05.12.2011 | PT | 26.12.2011 | LU | 27.04.2012 | BE | 30.04.2012 | CH | 30.04.2012 | LI | 30.04.2012 | MC | 30.04.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 24.08.2011 | |
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
IE | 24.08.2011 | ||
IT | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
TR | 24.08.2011 | ||
BG | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
ES | 05.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
LU | 27.04.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 24.08.2011 | |
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
IE | 24.08.2011 | ||
IT | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
TR | 24.08.2011 | ||
BG | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
ES | 05.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 24.08.2011 | |
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
IE | 24.08.2011 | ||
IT | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
BG | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
ES | 05.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 24.08.2011 | |
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
IE | 24.08.2011 | ||
IT | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
ES | 05.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | CY | 24.08.2011 | |
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
IE | 24.08.2011 | ||
IT | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | CY | 24.08.2011 | |
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
IE | 24.08.2011 | ||
IT | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 24.08.2011 | |
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
IE | 24.08.2011 | ||
IT | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | CY | 24.08.2011 | |
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
IE | 24.08.2011 | ||
IT | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | CY | 24.08.2011 | |
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
IE | 24.08.2011 | ||
IT | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | CY | 24.08.2011 | |
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
IE | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | CY | 24.08.2011 | |
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
IE | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | CY | 24.08.2011 | |
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | FI | 24.08.2011 | |
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | FI | 24.08.2011 | |
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | FI | 24.08.2011 | |
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | NL | 24.08.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9615285 (GOODRICH CO B F [US]) [A] 1-12* page 12, line 29 - page 13, line 32; figure 1; claim - *; | [DY]US6001419 (LELUAN JEAN-LUC [FR], et al) [DY] 1-12 * example -; claim - *; | [Y] - GLASIER G F ET AL, "Formation of pyrolytic carbon during the pyrolysis of ethane at high conversions", CARBON, XX, XX, (200101), vol. 39, no. 1, ISSN 0008-6223, pages 15 - 23, XP004319819 [Y] 1-12 * "3.2. Rates as a function of concentration", "2. Experimental";; figure 7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0008-6223(00)00079-8 | [A] - BECKER A ET AL, "Chemistry and kinetics of chemical vapor deposition of pyrocarbon--II pyrocarbon deposition from ethylene, acetylene and 1,3-butadiene in the low temperature regime", CARBON, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHING, NEW YORK, NY, US, (1998), vol. 36, no. 3, ISSN 0008-6223, pages 177 - 199, XP004118837 [A] 1-12 * "2. Experimental" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0008-6223(97)00175-9 | [A] - DELHAES P, "Chemical vapor deposition and infiltration processes of carbon materials", CARBON, XX, XX, (200204), vol. 40, no. 5, ISSN 0008-6223, pages 641 - 657, XP004345118 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0008-6223(01)00195-6 |