EP1622537 - METHOD AND MEANS WHICH ARE USED FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A SUPPORT BAR FOR PROSTHETIC TEETH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.04.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bompard, Bruno 30, avenue de Saxe 75007 Paris / FR | [2006/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/06] | Application number, filing date | 04742693.7 | 10.05.2004 | [2006/06] | WO2004FR01137 | Priority number, date | FR20030005838 | 15.05.2003 Original published format: FR 0305838 | [2006/06] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004100822 | Date: | 25.11.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/48] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1622537 | Date: | 08.02.2006 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61C13/00 | [2006/06] | CPC: |
B23B41/00 (EP);
A61C13/0003 (EP);
A61C8/0001 (EP);
A61C8/0048 (EP);
A61C8/005 (EP);
A61C8/0069 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND AUSFÜHRUNGSMITTEL FÜR DIE HERSTELLUNG EINER STÜTZSTANGE FÜR PROTHESEN | [2006/06] | English: | METHOD AND MEANS WHICH ARE USED FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A SUPPORT BAR FOR PROSTHETIC TEETH | [2006/06] | French: | PROCEDE ET MOYENS DE MIS EN OEUVRE POUR LA FABRICATION D'UNE BARRE SUPPORT DE DENTS PROTHETIQUES | [2006/06] | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.11.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/10] | 01.12.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/22] | 09.01.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.06.2006 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   05.07.2006 | 31.05.2007 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAY]DE19903482 (UNGER HEINZ DIETER) [X] 1,23 * column 1, line 23 - column 6, line 53 * * column 7, lines 42-52; figure - * [A] 12-20,24 [Y] 21; | [Y]US5055047 (NAMES CURTIS D) [Y] 21 * abstract *; | [A]US5725376 (POIRIER MICHEL) [A] 1-24 * the whole document *; | [A]US5630717 (ZUEST MAX ET AL) [A] 1-8,13-16,19,24 * the whole document *; | [DA]US6319000 (BRAANEMARK PER-INGVAR) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]AT392412B (RESCH WILFRIED; WEDENIG WOLFGANG) [A] 9,10,17,18 * the whole document * |