EP1618611 - METHOD FOR PRODUCTION OF A SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE WITH AUTO-ALIGNED METALLISATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.05.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 17.09.2014 [2014/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 25, rue Leblanc Immeuble "Le Ponant D" 75015 Paris / FR | [2006/44] |
Former [2006/04] | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 29-33, rue de la Fédération BP 510 75752 Paris Cedex 15 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIBEYRON, Pierre-Jean 191, Impasse des prés F-38330 SAINT ISMIER / FR | 02 /
* * * | [2008/30] |
Former [2007/15] | 01 /
RIBEYRON, Pierre-Jean 191, Impasse des prés F-38330 SAINT ISMIER / FR | ||
02 /
PIROT, Marc 178 route du Bourg 38140 Saint Blaise du Bois / FR | |||
Former [2006/04] | 01 /
RIBEYRON, Pierre-Jean 191, Impasse des prés F-38330 SAINT ISMIER / FR | ||
02 /
PIROT, Marc le Bourg F-38450 MIRIBEL-LANCHATRE / FR | Representative(s) | Poulin, Gérard, et al BREVALEX 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/04] | Poulin, Gérard, et al Brevatome 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 04742859.4 | 27.04.2004 | [2006/04] | WO2004FR50173 | Priority number, date | FR20030050136 | 29.04.2003 Original published format: FR 0350136 | [2006/04] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004097945 | Date: | 11.11.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1618611 | Date: | 25.01.2006 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1618611 | Date: | 23.07.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/0224, H01L31/18 | [2006/04] | CPC: |
H01L31/022433 (EP,US);
Y02E10/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINER HALBLEITER-VORRICHTUNG MIT SELBSTAUSRICHTENDEN METALLISCHEN KONTAKTEN | [2006/04] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCTION OF A SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE WITH AUTO-ALIGNED METALLISATIONS | [2006/04] | French: | PROCEDE DE REALISATION D UN DISPOSITIF SEMI-CONDUCTEUR A MET ALLISATIONS AUTO-ALIGNEES. | [2006/04] | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/04] | 07.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.07.2008 | CY | 23.07.2008 | CZ | 23.07.2008 | DK | 23.07.2008 | EE | 23.07.2008 | FI | 23.07.2008 | GR | 23.07.2008 | IE | 23.07.2008 | NL | 23.07.2008 | PL | 23.07.2008 | RO | 23.07.2008 | SI | 23.07.2008 | SK | 23.07.2008 | TR | 23.07.2008 | BG | 23.10.2008 | PT | 23.12.2008 | HU | 24.01.2009 | [2014/38] |
Former [2011/43] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
CY | 23.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2008 | ||
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
EE | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
IE | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
PL | 23.07.2008 | ||
RO | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
SK | 23.07.2008 | ||
TR | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
HU | 24.01.2009 | ||
Former [2011/32] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
CZ | 23.07.2008 | ||
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
EE | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
IE | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
PL | 23.07.2008 | ||
RO | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
SK | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
HU | 24.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/24] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
CZ | 23.07.2008 | ||
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
EE | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
IE | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
PL | 23.07.2008 | ||
RO | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
SK | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/26] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
CZ | 23.07.2008 | ||
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
EE | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
IE | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
RO | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
SK | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
CZ | 23.07.2008 | ||
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
EE | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
IE | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
SK | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
EE | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | FI | 23.07.2008 | |
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4927770 (SWANSON RICHARD M [US]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]US6396046 (POSSIN GEORGE EDWARD [US], et al) [A] 1-20* the whole document *; | [XA] - SWANSON R M ET AL, "POINT CONTACT SILICON SOLAR CELLS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ELECTRON DEVICES, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (198405), vol. 31, no. 5, ISSN 0018-9383, pages 661 - 664, XP001080038 [X] 1,2,8-11,19,20 * the whole document * [A] 3-7 | [A] - TILFORD C L ET AL, "Development of a 10 kW reflective dish PV system", PROCEEDINGS OF THE PHOTOVOLTAIC SPECIALISTS CONFERENCE. LOUISVILLE, MAY 10 - 14, 1993, NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19930510), vol. CONF. 23, ISBN 0-7803-1220-1, pages 1222 - 1227, XP010113231 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PVSC.1993.346947 | [A] - VERLINDEN P ET AL, "MULTILEVEL METALLIZATION FOR LARGE AREA POINT-CONTACT SOLAR CELLS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL PHOTOVOLTAIC ENERGY CONFERENCE. FLORENCE, MAY 9 - 13, 1988, DORDRECHT, KLUWER, NL, (19880509), vol. 2 CONF. 8, pages 1466 - 1471, XP000044541 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * |