EP1646860 - APPARATUS FOR AND METHOD OF MEASURING FLUORESCENCE LIFETIME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.06.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.07.2011 [2011/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ISIS INNOVATION LIMITED Ewert House, Ewert Place Summertown Oxford OX2 7SG / GB | [2006/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILSON, Tony 18 Jeune Street Oxford OX4 1BN / GB | 02 /
BOOTH, Martin 7a Cripley Road Oxford, OX2 0AH / GB | [2007/06] |
Former [2006/16] | 01 /
WILSON, Tony 18 Jeune Street Oxford OX4 1BN / GB | ||
02 /
BOOTH, Martin 25 Abbey Road Oxford OX2 0AD / GB | Representative(s) | Raynor, Simon Mark Murgitroyd & Company Milton Keynes Studio H1B 297 Upper Fourth Street Witan Studios Milton Keynes MK9 1EH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/16] | Raynor, Simon Mark Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Midsummer House, 413 Midsummer Boulevard Central Milton Keynes MK9 3BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 04743409.7 | 15.07.2004 | [2006/16] | WO2004GB03068 | Priority number, date | GB20030016736 | 17.07.2003 Original published format: GB 0316736 | [2006/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005010507 | Date: | 03.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1646860 | Date: | 19.04.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/64, G07D7/12 | [2006/16] | CPC: |
G01N21/6408 (EP,GB,US);
G07D7/1205 (EP,GB,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR MESSUNG VON FLUORESZENZLEBENSDAUER | [2006/16] | English: | APPARATUS FOR AND METHOD OF MEASURING FLUORESCENCE LIFETIME | [2006/16] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR MESURER LA DUREE DE VIE DE FLUORESCENCE | [2006/16] | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2004 | Search fee paid | 12.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/16] | 06.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/30] | 09.03.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/30] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.04.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2010 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4006360 (MUELLER WILLIAM A); | [A]US4591707 (STENZEL GERHARD [DE], et al); | [X]US5574790 (LIANG LOUIS H [US], et al); | [A]US6234537 (GUTMANN ROLAND [DE], et al); | [A]US6426505 (RAO GOVIND [US], et al); | [X]EP1237128 (SICPA HOLDING SA [CH]); | [A]US6576155 (BARBERA-GUILLEM EMILIO [US]); | by applicant | EP1237128 |