EP1642271 - MULTI-LAYER WRITABLE OPTICAL RECORD CARRIER WITH AN OPTIMUM POWER CALIBRATION AREA, AND METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR FORMING OPTIMUM POWER CALIBRATION AREAS ON SUCH A RECORD CARRIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [2009/34] |
Former [2006/14] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics, N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARTENS, Hubert C., F. c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
KOPPERS, Wilhelmus, R. c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
VAN DEN OETELAAR, Ronald, J., A. c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
WOERLEE, Pierre, H. c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2006/14] | Representative(s) | Uittenbogaard, Frank Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/14] | Uittenbogaard, Frank Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 04744365.0 | 18.06.2004 | [2006/14] | WO2004IB50936 | Priority number, date | EP20030101910 | 26.06.2003 Original published format: EP 03101910 | [2006/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004114289 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1642271 | Date: | 05.04.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1642271 | Date: | 19.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/007, G11B7/24 | [2006/14] | CPC: |
G11B7/24038 (EP,US);
G11B7/007 (KR);
G11B7/0045 (KR);
G11B7/00736 (EP,US);
G11B7/00745 (EP,US);
G11B7/1267 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEHRSCHICHTIGER BESCHREIBBARER OPTISCHER DATENTRÄGER MIT EINER FLÄCHE ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER OPTIMALEN SCHREIBLEISTUNG UND VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ERSTELLEN VON FLÄCHEN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER OPTIMALEN SCHREIBLEISTUNG AUF EINEM SOLCHEN DATENTÄGER | [2006/14] | English: | MULTI-LAYER WRITABLE OPTICAL RECORD CARRIER WITH AN OPTIMUM POWER CALIBRATION AREA, AND METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR FORMING OPTIMUM POWER CALIBRATION AREAS ON SUCH A RECORD CARRIER | [2006/14] | French: | SUPPORT DE DONNEES OPTIQUE INSCRIPTIBLE MULTICOUCHES POURVU D'UNE ZONE DE CALIBRAGE DE PUISSANCE OPTIMALE ET PROCEDE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE REALISER DES ZONES DE CALIBRAGE DE PUISSANCE OPTIMALE SUR CE TYPE DE SUPPORT DE DONNEES | [2006/14] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/14] | 23.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.08.2009 | BE | 19.08.2009 | CY | 19.08.2009 | CZ | 19.08.2009 | DK | 19.08.2009 | EE | 19.08.2009 | FI | 19.08.2009 | PL | 19.08.2009 | RO | 19.08.2009 | SE | 19.08.2009 | SI | 19.08.2009 | SK | 19.08.2009 | TR | 19.08.2009 | BG | 19.11.2009 | GR | 20.11.2009 | ES | 30.11.2009 | PT | 21.12.2009 | HU | 20.02.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | AT | 19.08.2009 | |
BE | 19.08.2009 | ||
CY | 19.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2009 | ||
DK | 19.08.2009 | ||
EE | 19.08.2009 | ||
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
PL | 19.08.2009 | ||
RO | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
SI | 19.08.2009 | ||
SK | 19.08.2009 | ||
BG | 19.11.2009 | ||
GR | 20.11.2009 | ||
ES | 30.11.2009 | ||
PT | 21.12.2009 | ||
HU | 20.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 19.08.2009 | |
BE | 19.08.2009 | ||
CY | 19.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2009 | ||
DK | 19.08.2009 | ||
EE | 19.08.2009 | ||
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
PL | 19.08.2009 | ||
RO | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
SI | 19.08.2009 | ||
SK | 19.08.2009 | ||
BG | 19.11.2009 | ||
GR | 20.11.2009 | ||
ES | 30.11.2009 | ||
PT | 21.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/28] | AT | 19.08.2009 | |
BE | 19.08.2009 | ||
CY | 19.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2009 | ||
DK | 19.08.2009 | ||
EE | 19.08.2009 | ||
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
PL | 19.08.2009 | ||
RO | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
SI | 19.08.2009 | ||
SK | 19.08.2009 | ||
BG | 19.11.2009 | ||
ES | 30.11.2009 | ||
PT | 21.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | AT | 19.08.2009 | |
CY | 19.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2009 | ||
DK | 19.08.2009 | ||
EE | 19.08.2009 | ||
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
PL | 19.08.2009 | ||
RO | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
SI | 19.08.2009 | ||
SK | 19.08.2009 | ||
BG | 19.11.2009 | ||
ES | 30.11.2009 | ||
PT | 21.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/22] | AT | 19.08.2009 | |
CY | 19.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2009 | ||
DK | 19.08.2009 | ||
EE | 19.08.2009 | ||
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
PL | 19.08.2009 | ||
RO | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
SI | 19.08.2009 | ||
BG | 19.11.2009 | ||
ES | 30.11.2009 | ||
PT | 21.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 19.08.2009 | |
CY | 19.08.2009 | ||
DK | 19.08.2009 | ||
EE | 19.08.2009 | ||
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
PL | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
SI | 19.08.2009 | ||
BG | 19.11.2009 | ||
ES | 30.11.2009 | ||
PT | 21.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | AT | 19.08.2009 | |
CY | 19.08.2009 | ||
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
PL | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
SI | 19.08.2009 | ||
BG | 19.11.2009 | ||
ES | 30.11.2009 | ||
PT | 21.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | AT | 19.08.2009 | |
CY | 19.08.2009 | ||
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
PL | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
SI | 19.08.2009 | ||
ES | 30.11.2009 | ||
PT | 21.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | AT | 19.08.2009 | |
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
PL | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
SI | 19.08.2009 | ||
ES | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 19.08.2009 | |
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
PL | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
ES | 30.11.2009 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP1187112 (PIONEER CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-13* paragraphs [0017] - [0042]; figures 4-8 *; | [DY]EP1244096 (NIPPON COLUMBIA [JP]) [DY] 1-13 * paragraphs [0079] - [0086]; figures 4-7 *; | [X]EP1318509 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-13 * paragraphs [0018] - [0051]; figures 1-14; examples 1-8 * | by applicant | EP1187112 | EP1318509 |