EP1641371 - BEVERAGE MAKER WITH ADJUSTABLE BREW CHAMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2007/30] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2006/14] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics, N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN DER MEER, Sijtze c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
FANECO, Simon, J. c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
EAST, Shaun, A. c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2006/14] | Representative(s) | Schouten, Marcus Maria NXP B.V. Intellectual Property & Licensing High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/14] | Schouten, Marcus Maria Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 04744378.3 | 22.06.2004 | [2006/14] | WO2004IB50967 | Priority number, date | EP20030101871 | 25.06.2003 Original published format: EP 03101871 | [2006/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004112556 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1641371 | Date: | 05.04.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1641371 | Date: | 25.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A47J31/44, A47J31/40 | [2006/14] | CPC: |
A47J31/368 (EP,US);
A47J31/0647 (EP,US);
A47J31/0668 (EP,US);
A47J31/4482 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GETRÄNKEZUBEREITUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT VERSTELLBARER BRÜHKAMMER | [2006/14] | English: | BEVERAGE MAKER WITH ADJUSTABLE BREW CHAMBER | [2006/14] | French: | APPAREIL POUR LA PREPARATION DE BOISSONS AVEC UNE CHAMBRE A INFUSION AJUSTABLE | [2006/14] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/14] | 15.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.07.2007 | BE | 25.07.2007 | CH | 25.07.2007 | CY | 25.07.2007 | CZ | 25.07.2007 | DK | 25.07.2007 | EE | 25.07.2007 | FI | 25.07.2007 | LI | 25.07.2007 | NL | 25.07.2007 | PL | 25.07.2007 | RO | 25.07.2007 | SI | 25.07.2007 | SK | 25.07.2007 | TR | 25.07.2007 | BG | 25.10.2007 | SE | 25.10.2007 | GR | 26.10.2007 | PT | 26.12.2007 | HU | 26.01.2008 | [2010/38] |
Former [2010/34] | AT | 25.07.2007 | |
BE | 25.07.2007 | ||
CH | 25.07.2007 | ||
CY | 25.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2007 | ||
DK | 25.07.2007 | ||
EE | 25.07.2007 | ||
FI | 25.07.2007 | ||
LI | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
PL | 25.07.2007 | ||
RO | 25.07.2007 | ||
SI | 25.07.2007 | ||
SK | 25.07.2007 | ||
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
SE | 25.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
HU | 26.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 25.07.2007 | |
BE | 25.07.2007 | ||
CH | 25.07.2007 | ||
CY | 25.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2007 | ||
DK | 25.07.2007 | ||
EE | 25.07.2007 | ||
FI | 25.07.2007 | ||
LI | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
PL | 25.07.2007 | ||
RO | 25.07.2007 | ||
SI | 25.07.2007 | ||
SK | 25.07.2007 | ||
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
SE | 25.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/29] | AT | 25.07.2007 | |
BE | 25.07.2007 | ||
CH | 25.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2007 | ||
DK | 25.07.2007 | ||
EE | 25.07.2007 | ||
FI | 25.07.2007 | ||
LI | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
PL | 25.07.2007 | ||
RO | 25.07.2007 | ||
SI | 25.07.2007 | ||
SK | 25.07.2007 | ||
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
SE | 25.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 25.07.2007 | |
BE | 25.07.2007 | ||
CH | 25.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2007 | ||
DK | 25.07.2007 | ||
EE | 25.07.2007 | ||
FI | 25.07.2007 | ||
LI | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
PL | 25.07.2007 | ||
RO | 25.07.2007 | ||
SK | 25.07.2007 | ||
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
SE | 25.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 25.07.2007 | |
BE | 25.07.2007 | ||
CH | 25.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2007 | ||
DK | 25.07.2007 | ||
FI | 25.07.2007 | ||
LI | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
PL | 25.07.2007 | ||
RO | 25.07.2007 | ||
SK | 25.07.2007 | ||
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
SE | 25.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/25] | AT | 25.07.2007 | |
BE | 25.07.2007 | ||
CH | 25.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2007 | ||
DK | 25.07.2007 | ||
FI | 25.07.2007 | ||
LI | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
PL | 25.07.2007 | ||
SK | 25.07.2007 | ||
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 25.07.2007 | |
BE | 25.07.2007 | ||
CH | 25.07.2007 | ||
DK | 25.07.2007 | ||
FI | 25.07.2007 | ||
LI | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
PL | 25.07.2007 | ||
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 25.07.2007 | |
BE | 25.07.2007 | ||
CH | 25.07.2007 | ||
FI | 25.07.2007 | ||
LI | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
PL | 25.07.2007 | ||
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | AT | 25.07.2007 | |
CH | 25.07.2007 | ||
FI | 25.07.2007 | ||
LI | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
PL | 25.07.2007 | ||
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | FI | 25.07.2007 | |
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | Cited in | International search | [X]CH596810 (EGLOFF & CIE) [X] 1,5 * column 2, lines 1-3; figure 2 *; | [X]EP0380450 (JURA ELEKTROAPPARATE FAB [CH]) [X] 1,2,4,10-12 * page 4, line 9 - page 5, line 18; figures 1,6-9,12,14-16 *; | [X]US5259296 (MIKAEL TORMA [CH], et al) [X] 1,3,4,6 * column 1, lines 44-48; figure - ** column 2, line 56 - column 8, line 43 *; | [X]US5316781 (LUESSI ANDRE [CH], et al) [X] 1,3,4,7-9 * column 1, line 6 - column 2, line 47; figures 1,4-8 * * column 5 - column 7, line 57 * | by applicant | US5492054 | WO0115582 |