EP1647056 - ENCAPSULATION STRUCTURE FOR DISPLAY DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2017/15] |
Former [2013/39] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2006/16] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIFKA, Herbert c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
VAN BUUL, Jeroen, H., A., M. c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
DUINEVELD, Paulus, C. c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
RIETJENS, Gerardus, H. c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2006/16] | Representative(s) | Reints Bok, Wouter Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2017/15] |
Former [2006/16] | Reints Bok, Wouter Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 04744542.4 | 09.07.2004 | [2006/16] | WO2004IB51182 | Priority number, date | EP20030102120 | 11.07.2003 Original published format: EP 03102120 | [2006/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005006441 | Date: | 20.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1647056 | Date: | 19.04.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1647056 | Date: | 12.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01L51/52 | [2013/46] | CPC: |
H10K59/8731 (EP,KR);
H05B33/04 (KR);
H10K50/8445 (US);
H01L23/28 (KR);
H01L23/29 (KR);
H05B33/10 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2006/16] | H01L27/14, H01L23/29 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/15] |
Former [2006/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERKAPSELUNGSSTRUKTUR FÜR ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNGEN | [2013/46] | English: | ENCAPSULATION STRUCTURE FOR DISPLAY DEVICES | [2006/16] | French: | STRUCTURE D'ENCAPSULATION DE DISPOSITIFS D'AFFICHAGE | [2006/16] |
Former [2006/16] | VERKAPSELUNGSAUFBAU FÜR ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNGEN | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 13.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/16] | 28.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.10.2016 | 11.10.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 04.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.04.2010 | Opposition(s) | 15.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 01.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.07.2004 | AT | 12.04.2017 | CY | 12.04.2017 | CZ | 12.04.2017 | DK | 12.04.2017 | EE | 12.04.2017 | ES | 12.04.2017 | FI | 12.04.2017 | IT | 12.04.2017 | MC | 12.04.2017 | NL | 12.04.2017 | PL | 12.04.2017 | PT | 12.04.2017 | RO | 12.04.2017 | SE | 12.04.2017 | SI | 12.04.2017 | SK | 12.04.2017 | TR | 12.04.2017 | IE | 09.07.2017 | LU | 09.07.2017 | BG | 12.07.2017 | GR | 13.07.2017 | BE | 31.07.2017 | CH | 31.07.2017 | LI | 31.07.2017 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 09.07.2004 | |
AT | 12.04.2017 | ||
CY | 12.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
TR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IE | 09.07.2017 | ||
LU | 09.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 09.07.2004 | |
AT | 12.04.2017 | ||
CY | 12.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
IE | 09.07.2017 | ||
LU | 09.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 09.07.2004 | |
AT | 12.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
IE | 09.07.2017 | ||
LU | 09.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
IE | 09.07.2017 | ||
LU | 09.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
IE | 09.07.2017 | ||
LU | 09.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
IE | 09.07.2017 | ||
LU | 09.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
IE | 09.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | NL | 12.04.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE19603746 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-28* column 3, line 14 - column 6, line 65; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP0822586 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [A] 1-28 * page 3, line 38 - page 4, line 37; figures 1-3 *; | [XAY]US2002125822 (GRAFF GORDON L [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9-12,20-28 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0054]; figures 1-3 * [A] 8,13-18 [Y] 19; | [XAY]US2003003225 (CHOI DO-HYUN [KR], et al) [X] 1,9-11,13-18,20-24,26-28 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0051]; figures 2,3A-C * [A] 2-8,12,25 [Y] 19; | [XA]EP1278244 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1-5,8-12,20-22,26-28 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0057]; figures 1-3E * [A] 6,7,13-19,23-25; | [XA]US6573652 (GRAFF GORDON LEE [US], et al) [X] 1-3,8-11,19,20,22,26-28 * column 3, line 9 - column 6, line 50; figures 1,2 * [A] 4-7,12-18,21,23-25; | [XA]US2003117066 (SILVERNAIL JEFFREY ALAN [US]) [X] 1-7,9,20,22,26-28 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0044]; figures 1-6 * [A] 8,10-19,21,23-25 | Examination | US6069087 | WO03050894 |