EP1651913 - A REFRIGERATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arçelik Anonim Sirketi E5 Ankara Asfalti Uzeri Tuzla 34950 Istanbul / TR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/04] | For all designated states Arcelik Anonim Sirketi E5 Ankara Asfalti Uzeri, Tuzla 34950 Istanbul / TR | ||
Former [2006/18] | For all designated states Arcelik Anonim Sirketi E5 Ankara Asfalti uzeri, Tuzla Istanbul, 34950 / TR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bayramli, Tanju, Arcelik Anonim Sirketi E5 Ankara Asfalti Uzeri, Tuzla 34950 Istanbul / TR | 02 /
Genc, Hakan, Arcelik Anonim Sirketi E5 Ankara Asfalti Uzeri, Tuzla 34950 Istanbul / TR | [2006/18] | Representative(s) | Berkkam, Ayfer, et al Ankara Patent Bureau Limited Kavaklidere Mahallesi Bestekar Caddesi No: 10 06680 Cankaya, Ankara / TR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/18] | Berkkam, Ayfer, et al Ankara Patent Bureau Limited, Bestekar Sokak No. 10, Kavaklidere 06680 Ankara / TR | Application number, filing date | 04744727.1 | 03.08.2004 | [2006/18] | WO2004IB51379 | Priority number, date | TR20030001275 | 05.08.2003 Original published format: TR 200301275 | [2006/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005012812 | Date: | 10.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1651913 | Date: | 03.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1651913 | Date: | 24.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F25D23/02, F25D25/02, E05D7/08 | [2006/18] | CPC: |
F25D23/025 (EP);
F25D25/024 (EP);
F25D2400/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EIN KÜHLSCHRANK | [2006/18] | English: | A REFRIGERATOR | [2006/18] | French: | REFRIGERATEUR | [2006/18] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/18] | 11.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.01.2007 | BE | 24.01.2007 | CH | 24.01.2007 | CY | 24.01.2007 | CZ | 24.01.2007 | EE | 24.01.2007 | FI | 24.01.2007 | LI | 24.01.2007 | NL | 24.01.2007 | PL | 24.01.2007 | SI | 24.01.2007 | SK | 24.01.2007 | BG | 24.04.2007 | SE | 24.04.2007 | GR | 25.04.2007 | PT | 25.06.2007 | HU | 25.07.2007 | IE | 03.08.2007 | LU | 03.08.2007 | MC | 31.08.2007 | [2015/21] |
Former [2009/41] | AT | 24.01.2007 | |
BE | 24.01.2007 | ||
CH | 24.01.2007 | ||
CY | 24.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2007 | ||
EE | 24.01.2007 | ||
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
LI | 24.01.2007 | ||
NL | 24.01.2007 | ||
PL | 24.01.2007 | ||
SI | 24.01.2007 | ||
SK | 24.01.2007 | ||
BG | 24.04.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
GR | 25.04.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
HU | 25.07.2007 | ||
IE | 03.08.2007 | ||
LU | 03.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 24.01.2007 | |
BE | 24.01.2007 | ||
CH | 24.01.2007 | ||
CY | 24.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2007 | ||
EE | 24.01.2007 | ||
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
LI | 24.01.2007 | ||
NL | 24.01.2007 | ||
PL | 24.01.2007 | ||
SI | 24.01.2007 | ||
SK | 24.01.2007 | ||
BG | 24.04.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
GR | 25.04.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
IE | 03.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 24.01.2007 | |
BE | 24.01.2007 | ||
CH | 24.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2007 | ||
EE | 24.01.2007 | ||
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
LI | 24.01.2007 | ||
NL | 24.01.2007 | ||
PL | 24.01.2007 | ||
SI | 24.01.2007 | ||
SK | 24.01.2007 | ||
BG | 24.04.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
GR | 25.04.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
IE | 03.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/45] | AT | 24.01.2007 | |
BE | 24.01.2007 | ||
CH | 24.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2007 | ||
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
LI | 24.01.2007 | ||
NL | 24.01.2007 | ||
PL | 24.01.2007 | ||
SI | 24.01.2007 | ||
SK | 24.01.2007 | ||
BG | 24.04.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
GR | 25.04.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
IE | 03.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 24.01.2007 | |
BE | 24.01.2007 | ||
CH | 24.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2007 | ||
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
LI | 24.01.2007 | ||
NL | 24.01.2007 | ||
PL | 24.01.2007 | ||
SI | 24.01.2007 | ||
SK | 24.01.2007 | ||
BG | 24.04.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
GR | 25.04.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/01] | AT | 24.01.2007 | |
BE | 24.01.2007 | ||
CH | 24.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2007 | ||
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
LI | 24.01.2007 | ||
NL | 24.01.2007 | ||
PL | 24.01.2007 | ||
SI | 24.01.2007 | ||
SK | 24.01.2007 | ||
BG | 24.04.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | AT | 24.01.2007 | |
CH | 24.01.2007 | ||
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
LI | 24.01.2007 | ||
NL | 24.01.2007 | ||
PL | 24.01.2007 | ||
SI | 24.01.2007 | ||
SK | 24.01.2007 | ||
BG | 24.04.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | AT | 24.01.2007 | |
CH | 24.01.2007 | ||
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
LI | 24.01.2007 | ||
NL | 24.01.2007 | ||
PL | 24.01.2007 | ||
SI | 24.01.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/43] | CH | 24.01.2007 | |
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
LI | 24.01.2007 | ||
NL | 24.01.2007 | ||
PL | 24.01.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2000274929 ; | [A]JPH10153369 ; | [A]FR1286742 (MME CORRE) [A] * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010205), vol. 2000, no. 13, & JP2000274929 A 20001006 (MATSUYAMA NOBUHIRO) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980930), vol. 1998, no. 11, & JP10153369 A 19980609 (SANDEN CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * |