EP1651301 - GUIDE WIRE FOR A CATHETER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/18] | GUIDE WIRE FOR USE WITH A CATHETER | ||
[2009/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.2011 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LAKE REGION MEDICAL R&D LIMITED Unit 4, Westlink Commercial Park Oranmore County Galway / IE | [2010/34] |
Former [2006/18] | For all designated states Brivant Research & Development Limited Unit 4, Westlink Commercial Park Oranmore County Galway / IE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUPTON, Henry William Minehill House Renville West Oranmore County Galway / IE | [2006/18] | Representative(s) | Gorman, Francis Fergus F. F. Gorman & Co. 15 Clanwilliam Square Dublin 2 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/18] | Gorman, Francis Fergus F. F. Gorman & Co. 15 Clanwilliam Square Dublin 2 / IE | Application number, filing date | 04744858.4 | 09.08.2004 | [2006/18] | WO2004IE00107 | Priority number, date | IE20030000585 | 07.08.2003 Original published format: IE 20030585 | [2006/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005014095 | Date: | 17.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1651301 | Date: | 03.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1651301 | Date: | 05.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/01, A61M25/00 | [2006/18] | CPC: |
A61M25/09 (EP,US);
A61M2025/09083 (EP,US);
A61M2025/09175 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FÜHRUNGSDRAHT FÜR EINEN KATHETER | [2006/18] | English: | GUIDE WIRE FOR A CATHETER | [2009/45] | French: | FIL DE GUIDAGE POUR UN CATHETER | [2009/45] |
Former [2006/18] | GUIDE WIRE FOR USE WITH A CATHETER | ||
Former [2006/18] | FIL DE GUIDAGE DESTINE A ETRE UTILISE AVEC UN CATHETER | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.01.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/18] | 05.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.05.2010 | BE | 05.05.2010 | CY | 05.05.2010 | CZ | 05.05.2010 | DK | 05.05.2010 | EE | 05.05.2010 | FI | 05.05.2010 | NL | 05.05.2010 | PL | 05.05.2010 | RO | 05.05.2010 | SE | 05.05.2010 | SI | 05.05.2010 | SK | 05.05.2010 | TR | 05.05.2010 | BG | 05.08.2010 | GR | 06.08.2010 | LU | 09.08.2010 | ES | 16.08.2010 | CH | 31.08.2010 | LI | 31.08.2010 | MC | 31.08.2010 | PT | 06.09.2010 | HU | 06.11.2010 | [2013/42] |
Former [2012/47] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
BE | 05.05.2010 | ||
BG | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
TR | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
LU | 09.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
CH | 31.08.2010 | ||
LI | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
HU | 06.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/44] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
BE | 05.05.2010 | ||
BG | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
LU | 09.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
CH | 31.08.2010 | ||
LI | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
HU | 06.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
BE | 05.05.2010 | ||
BG | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
CH | 31.08.2010 | ||
LI | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
HU | 06.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
BE | 05.05.2010 | ||
BG | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
CH | 31.08.2010 | ||
LI | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
BE | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
CH | 31.08.2010 | ||
LI | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
BE | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/05] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/04] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/52] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | NL | 05.05.2010 | |
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | NL | 05.05.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]US3500820 (ALMEN TORSTEN HAKAN OSKAR) [X] 1-13,44-58 * column 3, line 40 - column 7, line 63; figure - *; | [AD]US5365942 (SHANK PETER J [US]) [AD] 1,46,47* the whole document *; | [A]US5372144 (MORTIER TODD [US], et al) [A] 1,46,47 * column 5, line 63 - column 6, line 16; figure - *; | [A]EP0773037 (PACESETTER AB [SE]) [A] 1,46,47 * abstract *; | [A]WO0040288 (ADVANCED CARDIOVASCULAR SYSTEM [US]) [A] 1,46,47 * page 9, line 18 - page 10, line 8; figures 7-9 * |