EP1653595 - MOTOR GENERATOR AND ELECTRIC VEHICLE HAVING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.02.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.03.2016 [2016/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi, Shizuoka 438-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/18] | For all designated states YAMAHA HATSUDOKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi Shizuoka 438-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAITOU, Shinya, Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha 2500, Shingai Iwata-shi, Shizuoka 438-8501 / JP | 02 /
HINO, Haruyoshi, Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha 2500, Shingai Iwata-shi, Shizuoka 438-8501 / JP | 03 /
MUROTA, Keiko, Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha 2500, Shingai Iwata-shi, Shizuoka 438-8501 / JP | 04 /
ISHIHARA, Hiroyuki, Yamaha Hatsudoki K.K. 2500, Shingai Iwata-shi, Shizuoka 438-8501 / JP | [2006/18] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/18] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04745502.7 | 02.06.2004 | [2006/18] | WO2004JP07603 | Priority number, date | JP20030199078 | 18.07.2003 Original published format: JP 2003199078 | [2006/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005008865 | Date: | 27.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1653595 | Date: | 03.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.01.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H02K21/24 | [2006/18] | CPC: |
H02K21/026 (EP,US);
H02K7/116 (EP,US);
B62K2204/00 (EP,US);
H02K21/16 (EP,US);
H02K21/24 (EP,US);
Y02T10/64 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MOTOR-GENERATOR UND ELEKTRISCHES FAHRZEUG DAMIT | [2006/18] | English: | MOTOR GENERATOR AND ELECTRIC VEHICLE HAVING THE SAME | [2006/18] | French: | MOTEUR-GENERATEUR ET VEHICULE ELECTRIQUE COMPRENANT CE MOTEUR-GENERATEUR | [2006/18] | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.2006 | Translation filed | 20.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.2006 | Search fee paid | 20.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/18] | 07.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/12] | 17.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/12] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.09.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 19.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]FR910199 (SAFI) [X] 1-5,9-11,15-19 * page 2, column 1, line 26 - page 2, column 2, line 1; figure 1 * [I] 7,8; | [XI]US2453523 (DELBERT MCCULLOUGH) [X] 1-5,12,15,16 * column 3, line 17 - line 37; figure 1 * [I] 7,8; | [XI]US3525005 (BEYERS EDWARD STANLEY) [X] 1-5,9-11,13-19 * column 1, line 25 - line 27; figure 1 * * column 2, line 21 - line 23 *[I] 7,8; | [XI]EP1237258 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [X] 1-6,9-11,15-20 * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0055]; figures 8,9 * [I] 7,8 | International search | [Y]JPS4310683B ; | [A]JPS54103509U ; | [Y]JPS6034767U ; | [Y]JPH05300712 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [A]JP2001298901 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP, et al); | [Y]JP2002325412 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) | by applicant | FR910199 | US2453523 | US3525005 | JPH03215154 | JPH11122886 | EP1237258 |