EP1757428 - CATHERTER MOLDING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.10.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.11.2012 [2012/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pla Giken Co., Ltd. 39-6, Toyotsu-cho Suita-shi Osaka 564-0051 / JP | [2007/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIKUSAWA, Yoshiharu; c/o PLA GIKEN CO., LTD. 39-6, Toyotsu-cho, Suita-shi, Osaka; 5640051 / JP | [2011/49] |
Former [2007/09] | 01 /
KIKUSAWA, Yoshiharu; c/o PLA GIKEN CO., LTD. 39-6, Toyotsu-cho, Suita-shi, Osaka; 5640051 / JP | Representative(s) | Hering, Hartmut, et al Patentanwälte Berendt, Leyh & Hering Innere Wiener Strasse 20 81667 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/09] | Hering, Hartmut, et al Patentanwälte Berendt, Leyh & Hering Innere Wiener Strasse 20 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04745762.7 | 10.06.2004 | [2007/09] | WO2004JP08132 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005120804 | Date: | 22.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1757428 | Date: | 28.02.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1757428 | Date: | 07.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.12.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B29C47/02, B29C47/12, B29C47/28, B29C47/58, A61M25/00 | [2011/37] | CPC: |
A61M25/0012 (EP,US);
B29C48/06 (EP,US);
B29C48/09 (EP,US);
B29C48/15 (EP,US);
B29C48/21 (EP,US);
B29C48/255 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/18] | B29C47/04, B29C47/08, B29C47/20, B29C47/56, B29K105/20, B29L23/00 | ||
Former IPC [2007/09] | B29C47/04, B29C47/08, B29C47/20, B29C47/56, // B29K105/20, B29L23/00 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2007/38] |
Former [2007/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | KATHETERFORMVORRICHTUNG | [2007/09] | English: | CATHERTER MOLDING APPARATUS | [2007/09] | French: | APPAREIL DE MOULAGE DE CATHÉTER | [2007/09] | Entry into regional phase | 16.11.2006 | Translation filed | 15.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2006 | Search fee paid | 15.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 15.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/09] | 25.06.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.09.2011 | Opposition(s) | 10.09.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1456222 (PETZETAKIS N G PETZETAKIS M G, et al) [X] 1 * page 4, line 96 - page 5, line 17 * * figure 9 *; | [XY]US5792116 (BERG TODD A [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 8, line 8 - line 34 * * figure 5 * * column 11, line 19 - line 49; figures 2-6 * [Y] 2-6; | [A]US5938653 (PEPIN HENRY J [US]) [A] 1-6* column 6, line 33 - column 7, line 58; figures 3-6 *; | [Y]US6135992 (WANG JAMES C [US]) [Y] 2-6 * column 7, line 46 - column 8, line 41 * * column 11, line 19 - line 49 * * figures 2-6 * | International search | [A]JPH04212377 (TERUMO CORP); | [Y]JPH0526381 (KURASHIKI KAKO); | [Y]JPH05162186 (INOUE MTP KK); | [Y]JPH08336905 (ANDAASUN CORP); | [Y]JP2001088199 (PURA GIKEN KK); | [Y]JP2001277330 (TAHARA KK, et al); | [Y]JP2002331567 (PURA GIKEN KK); | [A]JP2003251680 (TERUMO CORP, et al) |