EP1634925 - TRANSPARENT FLEXIBLE COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.11.2011 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.12.2011 [2011/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JSR Corporation 6-10, Tsukiji 5-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8410 / JP | [2006/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUZUKI, Masanori c/o JSR Corporation 6-10, Tsukiji 5-chome, Chuo-Ku Tokyo 1048410 / JP | 02 /
MORIKAWA, Akihiko c/o JSR Corporation 6-10, Tsukiji 5-chome, Chuo-Ku Tokyo 1048410 / JP | 03 /
KAWATA, Takashi c/o JSR Corporation 6-10, Tsukiji 5-chome, Chuo-Ku Tokyo 1048410 / JP | [2006/11] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/11] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04745820.3 | 11.06.2004 | [2006/11] | WO2004JP08226 | Priority number, date | JP20030169784 | 13.06.2003 Original published format: JP 2003169784 | [2006/11] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004111132 | Date: | 23.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1634925 | Date: | 15.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.12.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C08L101/00, C08L53/02, C08L23/08, C08K5/00 | [2006/11] | CPC: |
C08L23/22 (EP,US);
C08L101/00 (KR);
C08K5/00 (KR);
C08K5/0008 (EP,US);
C08L53/02 (EP,KR,US);
C08L53/025 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/0008, C08L23/22 (EP,US);
C08L23/22, C08L2666/24 (US,EP);
C08L53/025, C08L2666/04 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/38] |
Former [2006/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRANSPARENTE FLEXIBLE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2006/11] | English: | TRANSPARENT FLEXIBLE COMPOSITION | [2006/11] | French: | COMPOSITION FLEXIBLE TRANSPARENTE | [2006/11] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2005 | Translation filed | 10.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2005 | Search fee paid | 10.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.04.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 10.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/11] | 11.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/50] | 28.07.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/50] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.02.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2011 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO02064676 (GLS CORP [US]) [A] 9,10* claims 1-7 * | International search | [X]JPH09263678 (JAPAN SYNTHETIC RUBBER CO LTD); | [A]JPH10130452 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP); | [A]JPH11172080 (NIPPON ZEON CO); | [A]JP2000204261 (GUNZE KOBUNSHI CORP); | [X]JP2001311012 (RIKEN VINYL IND); | [XP]JP2003183506 (RIKEN TECHNOS CORP) |