EP1642978 - METHOD OF DETECTING SARS CORONAVIRUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.12.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.01.2011 [2011/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EIKEN KAGAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA 4-19-9, Taito, Taito-ku Tokyo 110-8408 / JP | [2008/42] |
Former [2006/14] | For all designated states EIKEN KAGAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA 33-8, Hongo 1-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-8408 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MINEKAWA, Harumi, Nasu kojo, Eiken Kagaku K.K. 1381-3, Shimoishigami Otawara-shi, Tochigi 3240036 / JP | 02 /
WATANABE, Keiko, c/o Eiken Kagaku Kabushiki Kaisha 1-33-8, Hongo, Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 1138408 / JP | 03 /
KOJIYA, Shinichi, Eiken Kagaku Kabushiki Kaisha 1-33-8, Hongo, Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 1138408 / JP | [2006/14] | Representative(s) | Schrell, Andreas, et al Gleiss Grosse Schrell und Partner mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Leitzstrasse 45 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/14] | Schrell, Andreas, et al Gleiss Grosse Schrell & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Leitzstrasse 45 70469 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 04745909.4 | 15.06.2004 | [2006/14] | WO2004JP08355 | Priority number, date | JP20030184123 | 27.06.2003 Original published format: JP 2003184123 | JP20030384572 | 14.11.2003 Original published format: JP 2003384572 | [2006/14] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005001097 | Date: | 06.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1642978 | Date: | 05.04.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.01.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.01.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/50, C12N15/52, C12Q1/68, C12Q1/70 | [2006/14] | CPC: |
C12Q1/701 (EP,US);
C12Q1/686 (EP,US);
Y02A50/30 (EP);
Y10S435/975 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM NACHWEIS DES SARS-CORONAVIRUS | [2006/14] | English: | METHOD OF DETECTING SARS CORONAVIRUS | [2006/14] | French: | PROCEDE DE DETECTION DU CORONAVIRUS SARS | [2006/14] | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.2005 | Translation filed | 27.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 27.01.2006 | Search fee paid | 27.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/14] | 30.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 04.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/01] | 17.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2011/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2010 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]CN1458281 (HUANQIU ZHONGJIA BIOLOG SCIENC [CN]) [PX] 1,2,7,8 * Primer 27 is 21 nt long and exhibits an 100% identity in overlap, ungapped, with SEQ ID NO 1 between nts 97-117. *; | [A] - POUTANEN S M ET AL, "Identification of severe acute respiratory syndrome in Canada", NEW ENGLAND JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, THE, MASSACHUSETTS MEDICAL SOCIETY, WALTHAM, MA, US, (20030331), vol. 348, no. 20, ISSN 0028-4793, pages 1995 - 2005, XP002255633 [A] 1-8 * page 202 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJMoa030634 | [A] - YANG J ET AL, "CLINICAL DETECTION OF POLYMERASE GENE OF SARS-ASSOCIATED CORONAVIRUS", DI YI JUNYI DAXUE XUEBAO - ACADEMIC JOURNAL OF FIRST MEDICAL COLLEGE OF PLA, GAI KAN BIANJISHI, GUANGZHOU, CN, (200305), vol. 23, no. 5, ISSN 1000-2588, pages 424 - 427, XP008033954 [A] 1-8 * page 424 - page 425 * | International search | [Y]WO0028082 (EIKEN CHEMICAL [JP], et al); | [A]WO0224902 (EIKEN CHEMICAL [JP], et al); | [XP]CN1458281 (HUANQIU ZHONGJIA BIOLOG SCIENC [CN]); | [Y] - NOTOMI T. ET AL., "Loop-mediated isothermal amplification of DNA", NUCLEIC ACID RES., (2000), vol. 28, no. 12, page E63, XP002292090 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/28.12.e63 | [Y] - DROSTEN C. ET AL., "Identification of a novel coronavirus in patients with severe acute respiratory syndrome", N. ENGL. J. MED., (200305), vol. 348, no. 20, pages 1967 - 1976, XP001182527 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJMoa030747 | [Y] - YANG J. ET AL., "Clinical detection of polymerase egen of SARS-associated coronavirus", ACADEMIC J. FIRST MEDICAL COLLEGE OF PLA, (200305), vol. 23, no. 5, pages 424 - 427, XP008033954 | [Y] - EIKEN CHEMICAL CO. LTD., "Eiken kagaku, LAMP-ho o riyo shita SARS corona virus kenshutsu shiyaku kaihatsu de nagasaki daigaku nettai igaku kenkyusho to kyodo kenkyu o kaishi", (20030619), URL: http://www.tm.nagasaki-u.ac.jp/japanese/SARS_news_release.pdf, (20040803), XP002984956 | [Y] - MARRA M.A. ET AL., "SARS coronavirus, complete genome", GENBANK, (20030623), Database accession no. (NC_004718.3), XP002981786 | [Y] - FUJITSU LTD., "PRESS RELEASE LAMP-ho no tameno senyo primer sekkei shien service o web de teikyo LAMP-ho seihin hanbai no emarket place mo unyo kaishi", (20020516), URL: http://pr.fujitsu.com/jp/news/2002/05/16-1.html, (20040803), XP002984957 | [XP] - THAI H.T.C. ET AL., "Development and evaluation of a novel loop-mediated isothermal amplification methods for rapid detection of severe acute respiratory syndrome coronavirus", J. CLIN. MICROBIOL., (200405), vol. 42, no. 5, pages 1956 - 1961, XP002981787 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JCM.42.5.1956-1961.2004 | [XP] - ZHOU B. ET AL., "Identification and molecular cloning and sequence analysis of a novel coronavirus from patients with SARS by RT-PCR", CHINESE J. EXP. CLIN. VIROL., (200306), vol. 17, no. 2, pages 137 - 139, XP002981788 | [A] - POON L.L.M. ET AL., "Rapid detection of the severe acute respiratory syndrome (SARS) coronavirus by a loop-mediated isothermal amplification assay", CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, (20040628), vol. 50, no. 6, pages 1050 - 1052, XP002981789 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1373/clinchem.2004.032011 | [AP] - KIRIKAE T., "Tokushu SARS saishin joho kensaho no genjo to kongo no tenbo", ANTIBIOTIC & CHEMOTHERAPY, (200312), vol. 20, no. 1, pages 63 - 69, XP002984952 | by applicant | WO0028082 | WO0224902 | JP2001242169 | WO0183817 | - YANG ET AL., ACADEMIC J. FIRST MEDICAL COLLEGE OF PLA, (200305), vol. 23, no. 5, pages 424 - 427 | - DROSTEN C. ET AL., NEW ENG. J. MED., (2003), vol. 348, pages 1967 - 1976 |