EP1641329 - PRINTED WIRING BOARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.07.2013 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.08.2013 [2013/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IBIDEN CO., LTD. 2-1, Kanda-cho Ogaki-shi, Gifu 503-8604 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/13] | For all designated states IBIDEN CO., LTD. 2-1, Kanda-cho Ogaki-shi Gifu 503-8604 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSUKADA, Kiyotaka Ibiden Co., Ltd, 2-1, Kanda-cho Ogaki-shi, Gifu 503-8604 / JP | 02 /
IWATA, Toshimasa Ibiden Co., Ltd, 2-1, Kanda-cho Ogaki-shi, Gifu 503-8604 / JP | 03 /
NINOMARU, Terumasa Ibiden Co., Ltd, 2-1, Kanda-cho Ogaki-shi, Gifu 503-8604 / JP | 04 /
SUGIURA, Takamichi Ibiden Co., Ltd, 2-1, Kanda-cho Ogaki-shi, Gifu 503-8604 / JP | [2006/13] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/13] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04746190.0 | 21.06.2004 | [2006/13] | WO2004JP08721 | Priority number, date | JP20030186063 | 30.06.2003 Original published format: JP 2003186063 | [2006/13] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005002303 | Date: | 06.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1641329 | Date: | 29.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.01.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.01.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H05K1/16 | [2006/13] | CPC: |
H05K1/167 (EP,US);
H05K1/16 (KR);
H05K2201/0355 (EP,US);
H05K2203/0338 (EP,US);
H05K2203/0384 (EP,US);
H05K3/108 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, GB, NL [2006/40] |
Former [2006/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LEITERPLATTE | [2006/13] | English: | PRINTED WIRING BOARD | [2006/13] | French: | CARTE IMPRIMEE | [2006/13] | Entry into regional phase | 17.11.2005 | Translation filed | 16.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.2005 | Search fee paid | 16.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/13] | 13.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/34] | 28.03.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/34] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.01.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4204187 (KAKUHASHI TAKESHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5689227 (NGUYEN PHONG XUAN [US], et al) [Y] 4,5 * claim - *; | [XY]US6489035 (WANG JIANGTAO [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 7, line 64 - column 8, line 34 * * column 9, lines 22-64; figures 5-12 * [Y] 4,5; | [PX]EP1327995 (SHIPLEY CO LLC [US]) [PX] 1-3* figure 4; claim - * | International search | [Y]JPH09139608 (FUJITSU LTD); | [Y]JPH1079561 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD, et al); | [A]JPH10135608 (MACDERMID INC) |