EP1640370 - BIS (FLUORINE-CONTAINING PHTHALIC ANHYDRIDE) AND METHOD FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.02.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.03.2011 [2011/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON SHOKUBAI CO., LTD. 1-1, Koraibashi 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0043 / JP | [2006/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MASUDA, Go 8-1-204 ,Inodai 3-chome Toride-shi Ibaraki 3020015 / JP | 02 /
OKUMURA, Yasunori 3-35, Fukuda 4-chome, Tarumi-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo 6550013 / JP | 03 /
NISHIMAE, Shinji 23-2, Katsuraminamitatsumicho, Nishikyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 6158074 / JP | 04 /
NARAYA, Toshihiro 42, Sakamotocho 1-chome, Yokosuka-shi, Kanagawa 2380043 / JP | [2007/09] |
Former [2006/13] | 01 /
MASUDA, Go 9-10-106, Takashirocho, Suita-shi, Osaka 5640024 / JP | ||
02 /
OKUMURA, Yasunori 3-35, Fukuda 4-chome, Tarumi-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo 6550013 / JP | |||
03 /
NISHIMAE, Shinji 23-2, Katsuraminamitatsumicho, Nishikyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 6158074 / JP | |||
04 /
NARAYA, Toshihiro 42, Sakamotocho 1-chome, Yokosuka-shi, Kanagawa 2380043 / JP | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/13] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04746298.1 | 17.06.2004 | [2006/13] | WO2004JP08829 | Priority number, date | JP20030172046 | 17.06.2003 Original published format: JP 2003172046 | JP20030201123 | 24.07.2003 Original published format: JP 2003201123 | [2006/13] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004111026 | Date: | 23.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1640370 | Date: | 29.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.12.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07D307/89, C08G73/10, C08L79/08 | [2006/13] | CPC: |
C07C253/30 (EP,US);
C07D307/89 (EP,US);
C07D407/12 (EP,US);
C08G73/1039 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C253/30, C07C255/54 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/38] |
Former [2006/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BIS(FLUORHALTIGES PHTHALISÄUREANHYDRID) UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | [2006/13] | English: | BIS (FLUORINE-CONTAINING PHTHALIC ANHYDRIDE) AND METHOD FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF | [2006/13] | French: | BIS(ANHYDRIDE PHTALIQUE CONTENANT DU FLUOR) ET SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION | [2006/13] | Entry into regional phase | 10.01.2006 | Translation filed | 12.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.2006 | Search fee paid | 12.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/13] | 08.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/10] | 20.10.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3956320 (HEATH DARRELL R, et al) [Y] 3,5,7 * example 13 * * column 19, line 39 - column 20, line 5 *; | [X]EP0438382 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [X] 1,2 * abstract *; | [XY]EP0480266 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]) [X] 1,2 * examples 1,13-17; claims 3,9-17 * * page 20, line 1 - page 21, line 49 * [Y] 3-5,7; | [Y]WO9514000 (OCCIDENTAL CHEM CO [US], et al) [Y] 3,4,7 * example 3; claim 1 * * page 1, line 1 - page 7, line 4 *; | [A] - FALBE,J., REGITZ, M. (HERAUSGEBER), RÖMPP LEXIKON CHEMIE, 10.Auflage, BAND 3: H-L, STUTTGART, G. THIEME VERLAG, (1997), XP002493445 [A] 1 * page 2275 - page 2276 * * page 2436 - page 2437 * | International search | [Y]US2411567 (WOTHERSPOON FISHER JAMES); | [Y]JPS5463039 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS); | [Y]JPS6242980 (BASF CORP); | [Y]JPH03176484 (JAPAN CARLIT CO LTD); | [Y]JPH07278544 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [Y]JPH0931014 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]); | [Y]JPH09505287 ; | [Y]JPH1030013 (NITTO DENKO CORP); | [Y]JP2001335571 (NIHON NOHYAKU CO LTD); | [Y]JP2002332268 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND); | [YP]JP2003238515 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND) |