EP1647574 - RESIN COMPOSITION FOR SLIDING MEMBER AND SLIDING MEMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.01.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 09.06.2021 [2021/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oiles Corporation 1-2-70 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2020/07] |
Former [2006/16] | For all designated states OILES CORPORATION 30-5, Hamamatsu-cho 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8584 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANASE, Sumihide c/o Fujisawa Plant OILES CORPORATION 8, Kirihara-cho Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa 252-0811 / JP | 02 /
NAKAMARU, Takashi c/o Fujisawa Plant OILES CORPORATION 8, Kirihara-cho Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa 252-0811 / JP | 03 /
YAMASHITA, Eiichi c/o Fujisawa Plant OILES CORPORATION 8, Kirihara-cho Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa 252-0811 / JP | 04 /
TAKAMURA, Satoshi c/o Fujisawa Plant OILES CORPORATION 8, Kirihara-cho Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa 252-0811 / JP | [2020/09] |
Former [2006/16] | 01 /
YANASE, S., c/o Fujisawa Plant, OILES CORPORATION 8, Kirihara-cho Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa 2520811 / JP | ||
02 /
NAKAMARU, T., c/o Fujisawa Plant, OILES CORP. 8, Kirihara-cho Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa 2520811 / JP | |||
03 /
YAMASHITA, Eiichi, c/o Fujisawa Plant, OILES CORP. 8, Kirihara-cho Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa 2520811 / JP | |||
04 /
TAKAMURA, Satoshi, c/o Fujisawa Plant, OILES CORP. 8, Kirihara-cho Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa 2520811 / JP | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/09] | J A Kemp LLP 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2008/29] | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2006/16] | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04747197.4 | 08.07.2004 | [2006/16] | WO2004JP09729 | Priority number, date | JP20030198994 | 18.07.2003 Original published format: JP 2003198994 | [2006/16] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005007741 | Date: | 27.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1647574 | Date: | 19.04.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1647574 | Date: | 26.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.01.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B05D5/08, C08L27/18, C08K3/30, C08K3/32, C08K3/34, C08K3/00, F16C33/20 | [2017/25] | CPC: |
C08K3/34 (EP,US);
C08K3/30 (EP,US);
C08L27/18 (EP,US);
F16C33/125 (EP);
F16C33/201 (EP,US);
F16C33/206 (EP);
F16C33/208 (EP);
B05D2202/10 (EP,US);
B05D2350/65 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L27/18, C08L2666/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/16] | C08L27/18, C08K3/30, C08K3/32, C08K3/34, C08K3/00, F16C33/20 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2020/09] |
Former [2006/43] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2006/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR GLEITELEMENT UND GLEITELEMENT | [2006/16] | English: | RESIN COMPOSITION FOR SLIDING MEMBER AND SLIDING MEMBER | [2006/16] | French: | COMPOSITION DE RESINE POUR ELEMENT COULISSANT ET ELEMENT COULISSANT | [2006/16] | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2006 | Translation filed | 11.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2006 | Search fee paid | 11.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/16] | 23.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 03.10.2019 | 03.10.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 16.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.01.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.06.2009 | Opposition(s) | 27.11.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 25.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 08.07.2020 | FR | 31.07.2020 | [2021/23] |
Former [2021/22] | GB | 08.07.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5447774 (TANAKA TADASHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-6* column 2, lines 29-31; claim 5 *; | [XY]EP0684283 (OILES INDUSTRY CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,6 * figure 1; example 1; table 1 * [Y] 1-6; | [XY]US5616406 (NAKAMARU TAKASHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4 * figure 1; example 5; table 1 * [Y] 1-6; | [Y]EP1132634 (OILES INDUSTRY CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-6 * figure 1; example 2; table 5 * | International search | [A]JPH03212442 (OILES INDUSTRY CO LTD); | [A]JPH0841484 (OILES INDUSTRY CO LTD); | [A]JPH0860170 (OILES INDUSTRY CO LTD); | [A]JPH11257356 (OILES INDUSTRY CO LTD) | by applicant | US5447774 | EP0684283 | US5616406 | EP1132634 |