EP1645119 - IMAGE PROJECTOR, INCLINATION ANGLE DETECTING METHOD, AND PROJECTION IMAGE CORRECTION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 07.02.2014 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2014 | Refusal of application | published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CASIO COMPUTER CO., LTD. 6-2, Hon-machi 1-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-8543 / JP | [2006/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
INOUE Hideaki 30-20,Inadaira 5-chome Musashimurayama-shi Tokyo 208-0023 / JP | [2006/15] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/15] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04747731.0 | 13.07.2004 | [2006/15] | WO2004JP10267 | Priority number, date | JP20030275004 | 15.07.2003 Original published format: JP 2003275004 | [2006/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005006073 | Date: | 20.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1645119 | Date: | 12.04.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/74 | [2006/15] | CPC: |
H04N9/3185 (EP,US);
G03B21/00 (KR);
G03B21/14 (EP,US);
G03B21/56 (KR);
H04N5/74 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/43] |
Former [2006/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BILDPROJEKTOR, VERFAHREN ZUR ERKENNUNG DES NEIGUNGSWINKELS UND PROJEKTIONSBILDKORREKTURVERFAHREN | [2006/15] | English: | IMAGE PROJECTOR, INCLINATION ANGLE DETECTING METHOD, AND PROJECTION IMAGE CORRECTION METHOD | [2006/15] | French: | APPAREIL PROJECTEUR, PROCEDE DE DEFINITION D'ANGLE D'INCLINAISON ET PROCEDE DE CORRECTION D'IMAGE DE PROJECTION | [2006/15] | Entry into regional phase | 03.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 03.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/15] | 29.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2013 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2014/11] | 24.06.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.10.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2014/11] | 16.10.2013 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.07.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2013 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0689353 (CANON KK [JP]) [Y] 1,2,5,6,9 * page 7, line 20 - line 47 * * figures 2,6 *; | [Y]US6230070 (YODOSHI TATSUO [JP]) [Y] 1,2,5,6,9 * column 10, line 1 - line 33 *; | [YA]EP1193541 (SHADOW ENTERTAINMENT INC [JP]) [Y] 2 * page 3, line 42 - page 5, line 22 * [A] 1 | Examination | JP2001186538 |