EP1635495 - MULTI-CARRIER TRANSMITTER APPARATUS, MULTI-CARRIER RECEIVER APPARATUS, AND MULTI-CARRIER COMMUNICATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.09.2007 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [2006/11] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUKUOKA, Masaru 4-66-2-5-207, Unedanishi, Kanazawa-shi Ishikawa 920-0342 / JP | 02 /
YOSHII, Isamu 6-3-403, Akemi, Urayasu-shi Chiba 279-0014 / JP | 03 /
FUTAGI, Sadaki 67-3, Mikawanaka-machi, Hakusan-shi Ishikawa 929-0224 / JP | 04 /
MATSUMOTO, Atsushi Ni-53-1-101, Nanatsuya-machi, Kanazawa-shi Ishikawa 920-0021 / JP | 05 /
KITAHARA, Takashi Ni 103, Sano, Terai-machi Nomi-gun, Ishikawa 923-1112 / JP | [2006/11] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/11] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04747773.2 | 14.07.2004 | [2006/11] | WO2004JP10357 | Priority number, date | JP20030274366 | 14.07.2003 Original published format: JP 2003274366 | [2006/11] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005006622 | Date: | 20.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1635495 | Date: | 15.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04J11/00 | [2006/11] | CPC: |
H04L1/0071 (EP,US);
H04L5/0044 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/42] |
Former [2006/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | MEHRTRÄGER-SENDEVORRICHTUNG, MEHRTRÄGER-EMPFANGSVORRICHTUNG UND MEHRTRÄGER-KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN | [2006/11] | English: | MULTI-CARRIER TRANSMITTER APPARATUS, MULTI-CARRIER RECEIVER APPARATUS, AND MULTI-CARRIER COMMUNICATION METHOD | [2006/11] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRANSMISSION MULTI-PORTEUSE, APPAREIL DE RECEPTION MULTI-PORTEUSE, ET PROCEDE DE COMMUNICATION MULTI-PORTEUSE | [2006/11] | Entry into regional phase | 03.01.2006 | Translation filed | 03.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 03.01.2006 | Search fee paid | 03.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/11] | 25.09.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH07202852 (PFU LTD); | [A]JPH08223624 (NEC CORP); | [Y]JP2001230735 (COMM RES LAB MPHPT, et al); | [XP] - FUKUOKA, S. ET AL., "OFDM ni Okeru Modulation Diversity Hoshiki no Tekio Interleaver ni Kansuru Kento", 2003 NEN THE INSTITUTE OF ELECTRONICS, INFORMATION AND COMMUNICATION ENGINEERS SOCIETY TAIKAI KOEN RONBUNSHU 1, (20030910), page 456, XP002985631 | [Y] - "Modulation diversity for OFDM", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 #31 R1-030156, (20030221), XP002903416 | [A] - SLIMANE, B., "An Improved PSK Scheme for Fading Channels", GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE, 1996. GLOBECOM '96. COMMUNICATIONS: THE KEY TO GLOBAL PROSPERITY, (1996), vol. 2, no. 11, pages 1276 - 1280, XP000741631 |