EP1649942 - SUCTION DEVICE AND NOZZLE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.08.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.09.2014 [2014/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sankyo Aqua System Co., Ltd. 4-8-14, Akasaka Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0052 / JP | For all designated states Kawamoto, Eiichi Kasugadai 3-1 Fukuyama-shi Hiroshima 721-0916 / JP | [2006/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWAMOTO, Eiichi 3-1, Kasugadai Fukuyama-shi, Hiroshima 7210916 / JP | [2006/17] | Representative(s) | Jenkins, Peter David, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/17] | Jenkins, Peter David, et al PAGE WHITE & FARRER 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 04747807.8 | 22.07.2004 | [2006/17] | WO2004JP10396 | Priority number, date | JP20030283109 | 30.07.2003 Original published format: JP 2003283109 | [2006/17] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005011882 | Date: | 10.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1649942 | Date: | 26.04.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.02.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B08B5/04, B08B3/02, A61H35/00 | [2006/17] | CPC: |
B08B3/026 (EP,US);
B08B2203/0229 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2006/45] |
Former [2006/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SAUGVORRICHTUNG UND DÜSENVORRICHTUNG | [2006/17] | English: | SUCTION DEVICE AND NOZZLE DEVICE | [2006/17] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ASPIRATION ET DISPOSITIF DE BUSE | [2006/17] | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.2006 | Translation filed | 09.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.2006 | Search fee paid | 09.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/17] | 05.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/37] | 07.05.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/37] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.08.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2006 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.09.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5640739 (CAMPBELL JOANNE MARIE [US]) [X] 1,3-7,9,10,12,14 * column 6, line 1 - line 53 * * figures 4,5 *; | [XD]JP2001276172 (SANKYO REIJAKKU KK, et al) [XD] 1,10* figures 3,4,6 *; | [X]WO02091898 (SADAUNE DAVID [FR], et al) [X] 1-3,5-8,10-13 * page 5, line 19 - page 6, line 8 * * figures 2,3,4 * | International search | [Y]JP2000070888 (FOR YOU KK); | [Y]JP2001149870 (MITSUBISHI MATERIAL SILICON, et al); | [A]JP2002165821 (SAWARA HITOSHI) | by applicant | US5640739 | WO02091898 |