EP1646107 - MOUNTING TYPE RECEIVER, MOUNTING TYPE TRANSMITTER, MOUNTING TYPE TRANSMITTER-RECEIVER, ANTENNA, RECEIVER, TRANSMITTER, AND TRANSMITTER-RECEIVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.2009 [2009/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CITIZEN HOLDINGS CO., LTD. 1-12, Tanashicho 6-chome Nishitokyo-shi Tokyo 188-8511 / JP | [2007/34] |
Former [2006/15] | For all designated states CITIZEN WATCH CO. LTD. 1-12, Tanashicho 6-chome, Nishitokyo-shi Tokyo 188-8511 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SATO, Nobuhiro, c/o CITIZEN WATCH CO., LTD. 1-12, Tanashicho 6-chome Nishitokyo-shi, Tokyo 1888511 / JP | 02 /
KATO, Yuichi, c/o CITIZEN WATCH CO., LTD. 1-12, Tanashicho 6-chome Nishitokyo-shi, Tokyo 1888511 / JP | [2006/15] | Representative(s) | Green, Mark Charles, et al Murgitroyd & Company London Euston House 24 Eversholt Street London NW1 1AD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/45] | Green, Mark Charles, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 30 Welbeck Street London W1G 8ER / GB | ||
Former [2007/48] | Foxon, Rachel Siobhan, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Churchill House, Churchill Way, Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | ||
Former [2007/34] | Rees, Alexander Ellison, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 30 Welbeck Street London W1G 8ER / GB | ||
Former [2006/21] | Rees, Alexander Ellison Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 30 Welbeck Street London W1G 8ER / GB | ||
Former [2006/15] | Browne, Robin Forsythe Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 04747916.7 | 16.07.2004 | [2006/15] | WO2004JP10553 | Priority number, date | JP20030275447 | 16.07.2003 Original published format: JP 2003275447 | [2006/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005008830 | Date: | 27.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/04] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1646107 | Date: | 12.04.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.05.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/24, H01Q7/06, H04B1/38, H04B1/18, H01Q1/27 | [2007/20] | CPC: |
H01Q7/08 (EP,US);
G04G21/04 (EP,US);
G04R60/12 (EP,US);
H01Q1/243 (EP,US);
H01Q1/273 (EP,US);
H01Q7/06 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/15] | H01Q1/24, H01Q7/06, H04B1/38, H04B1/18 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/43] |
Former [2006/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANBRING-TYP-EMPFÄNGER, ANBRING-TYP-SENDER, ANBRING-TYP-SENDER/-EMPFÄNGER, ANTENNE, EMPFÄNGER, SENDER UND SENDER/EMPFÄNGER | [2006/15] | English: | MOUNTING TYPE RECEIVER, MOUNTING TYPE TRANSMITTER, MOUNTING TYPE TRANSMITTER-RECEIVER, ANTENNA, RECEIVER, TRANSMITTER, AND TRANSMITTER-RECEIVER | [2006/15] | French: | RECEPTEUR A MONTER, EMETTEUR A MONTER, EMETTEUR-RECEPTEUR A MONTER, ANTENNE, RECEPTEUR, EMETTEUR ET EMETTEUR-RECEPTEUR | [2006/15] | Entry into regional phase | 30.12.2005 | Translation filed | 30.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 30.12.2005 | Search fee paid | 30.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/15] | 19.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/45] | 08.06.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2009 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5561438 (NAKAZAWA TOSHIHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1,6,7,19,20,25,26 * abstract *; | [A]DE29607866U (JUNGHANS UHREN GMBH [DE]) [A] 4 * figure 5 *; | [A]JP2000105285 (CITIZEN WATCH CO LTD) [A] 5 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO03044894 (BROADSAT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [A] 1* figures 1,4 * | International search | [Y]JPS4911640U ; | [A]JPH05160624 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [Y]JPH06232616 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE); | [Y]JPH0936651 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD); | [A]JPH09321639 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD); | [Y]JPH10163734 (SHARP KK); | [A]JP2003152582 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [XE]JP2005026841 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP) |