EP1634410 - CONNECTING SYSTEM, INVERSE MULTIPLEXER, DATA COMMUNICATION NETWORK, METHOD AND COMPUTER PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: BE | published on 09.09.2015 [2015/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nederlandse Organisatie voor toegepast- natuurwetenschappelijk onderzoek TNO Anna van Buerenplein 1 2595 DA 's-Gravenhage / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/11] | For all designated states Nederlandse Organisatie voor Toegepast-Natuurwetenschappelijk Onderzoek TNO Schoemakerstraat 97 2628 VK Delft / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAARHUIS, Jan, Herman Apollolaan 126 NL-7534 HG Enschede / NL | 02 /
SWEERS, Bart-Jan Reggestraat 6 NL-2515 TL Den Haag / NL | [2006/11] | Representative(s) | Winckels, Johannes Hubertus F., et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/11] | Winckels, Johannes Hubertus F., et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 04748638.6 | 09.06.2004 | [2006/11] | WO2004NL00406 | Priority number, date | NL20031023631 | 10.06.2003 Original published format: NL 1023631 | [2006/11] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004109983 | Date: | 16.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1634410 | Date: | 15.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1634410 | Date: | 01.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/28, H04L12/46, H04L12/56, H04M11/06 | [2006/11] | CPC: |
H04L12/2856 (EP,US);
H04L12/28 (KR);
H04L47/10 (US);
H04L12/46 (EP,KR,US);
H04L47/125 (EP,US);
H04L47/43 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGSSYSTEM, INVERS-MULTIPLEXER, DATENÜBERTRAGUNGSNETZ, VERFAHREN UND COMPUTER-PROGRAMM | [2006/11] | English: | CONNECTING SYSTEM, INVERSE MULTIPLEXER, DATA COMMUNICATION NETWORK, METHOD AND COMPUTER PROGRAM | [2006/11] | French: | SYSTEME DE CONNEXION, MULTIPLEXEUR INVERSE, RESEAU DE COMMUNICATION DE DONNEES, PROCEDE ET PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE | [2006/11] | Entry into regional phase | 06.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 06.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/11] | 28.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.08.2007 | CH | 01.08.2007 | CY | 01.08.2007 | CZ | 01.08.2007 | DK | 01.08.2007 | EE | 01.08.2007 | LI | 01.08.2007 | PL | 01.08.2007 | RO | 01.08.2007 | SI | 01.08.2007 | SK | 01.08.2007 | TR | 01.08.2007 | BG | 01.11.2007 | GR | 02.11.2007 | ES | 12.11.2007 | PT | 02.01.2008 | HU | 02.02.2008 | [2015/37] |
Former [2010/38] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
BE | 01.08.2007 | ||
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
CY | 01.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2007 | ||
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
EE | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
PL | 01.08.2007 | ||
RO | 01.08.2007 | ||
SI | 01.08.2007 | ||
SK | 01.08.2007 | ||
TR | 01.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
HU | 02.02.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
BE | 01.08.2007 | ||
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
CY | 01.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2007 | ||
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
EE | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
PL | 01.08.2007 | ||
RO | 01.08.2007 | ||
SI | 01.08.2007 | ||
SK | 01.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
HU | 02.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
BE | 01.08.2007 | ||
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
CY | 01.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2007 | ||
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
EE | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
PL | 01.08.2007 | ||
RO | 01.08.2007 | ||
SI | 01.08.2007 | ||
SK | 01.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
BE | 01.08.2007 | ||
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2007 | ||
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
EE | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
PL | 01.08.2007 | ||
RO | 01.08.2007 | ||
SI | 01.08.2007 | ||
SK | 01.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
BE | 01.08.2007 | ||
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2007 | ||
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
EE | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
PL | 01.08.2007 | ||
RO | 01.08.2007 | ||
SK | 01.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
BE | 01.08.2007 | ||
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2007 | ||
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
PL | 01.08.2007 | ||
RO | 01.08.2007 | ||
SK | 01.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/25] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
BE | 01.08.2007 | ||
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2007 | ||
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
PL | 01.08.2007 | ||
SK | 01.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
BE | 01.08.2007 | ||
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
PL | 01.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
BE | 01.08.2007 | ||
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
PL | 01.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
PL | 01.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | BG | 01.11.2007 | |
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | ES | 12.11.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1009154 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1,2,16,21 * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0015] ** paragraphs [0034] - [0036] *; | [X]WO0191383 (INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE], et al) [X] 21-23 * page 2, line 6 - line 13 * * page 3, line 10 - line 29 * * page 6, line 7 - line 33 * * page 8, line 13 - line 14 * |