EP1648543 - FOREHEAD REST FOR RESPIRATORY MASKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.02.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.02.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.10.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fisher & Paykel Healthcare Limited 15 Maurice Paykel Place East Tamaki 1706 Auckland / NZ | [N/P] |
Former [2006/17] | For all designated states Fisher & Paykel Healthcare Limited 15 Maurice Paykel Place East Tamaki 1706 Auckland / NZ | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCAULEY, Alastair Edwin@c/o Fisher & Paykel Healthcare Ltd 15 Maurice Paykel Place East Tamaki 1706 Auckland / NZ | 02 /
NIGHTINGALE, Christopher Earl 188 Main Highway Ellerslie, Auckland, 1005 / NZ | 03 /
SHOTBOLT, Aidan Mark 1/2 Dalwhinnie Parade Highlands Park, Auckland, 1705 / NZ | 04 /
GRANT, Stuart Robert Allen 1/562 Remuera Road Remuera, Auckland, 1005 / NZ | 05 /
GRADON, Lewis George 22 Brailsford Court Howick, Auckland, 1705 / NZ | [2018/13] |
Former [2007/34] | 01 /
MCAULEY, Alastair Edwin c/o Fisher & Paykel Healthcare Ltd 15 Maurice Paykel Place East Tamaki 1706 Auckland / NZ | ||
02 /
NIGHTINGALE, Christopher Earl 188 Main Highway Ellerslie, Auckland, 1005 / NZ | |||
03 /
SHOTBOLT, Aidan Mark 1/2 Dalwhinnie Parade Highlands Park, Auckland, 1705 / NZ | |||
04 /
GRANT, Stuart Robert Allen 1/562 Remuera Road Remuera, Auckland, 1005 / NZ | |||
05 /
GRADON, Lewis George 22 Brailsford Court Howick, Auckland, 1705 / NZ | |||
Former [2006/17] | 01 /
MCAULEY, Alastair Edwin 5/27 Lucerne Road Remuera, Auckland, 1005 / NZ | ||
02 /
NIGHTINGALE, Christopher Earl 188 Main Highway Ellerslie, Auckland, 1005 / NZ | |||
03 /
SHOTBOLT, Aidan Mark 1/2 Dalwhinnie Parade Highlands Park, Auckland, 1705 / NZ | |||
04 /
GRANT, Stuart Robert Allen 1/562 Remuera Road Remuera, Auckland, 1005 / NZ | |||
05 /
GRADON, Lewis George 22 Brailsford Court Howick, Auckland, 1705 / NZ | Representative(s) | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles, et al Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [2018/13] |
Former [2012/13] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles, et al Forrester & Boehmert SkyGarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/44] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 Munich / DE | ||
Former [2006/17] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04748860.6 | 27.07.2004 | [2006/17] | WO2004NZ00165 | Priority number, date | NZ20030527313 | 30.07.2003 Original published format: NZ 52731303 | [2006/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005009521 | Date: | 03.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1648543 | Date: | 26.04.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1648543 | Date: | 28.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 03.02.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61M16/06 | [2013/02] | CPC: |
A61M16/06 (EP,US);
A61M16/0644 (US);
A61M16/0057 (US);
A61M16/0066 (US);
A61M16/0616 (EP,US);
A61M16/0622 (EP,US);
A61M16/0633 (EP,US);
A61M16/0655 (US);
A61M16/0875 (US);
|
Former IPC [2006/17] | A61M16/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/13] |
Former [2006/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | STIRNAUFLAGE FÜR ATEMMASKEN | [2006/17] | English: | FOREHEAD REST FOR RESPIRATORY MASKS | [2006/17] | French: | SUPPORT FRONTAL POUR MASQUES RESPIRATOIRES | [2006/17] | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.2006 | Search fee paid | 17.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.05.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 17.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/17] | 03.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.02.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP18163721.6 / EP3395390 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.02.2017 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 01.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 20.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 18.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.07.2004 | AT | 28.03.2018 | CY | 28.03.2018 | CZ | 28.03.2018 | DK | 28.03.2018 | EE | 28.03.2018 | ES | 28.03.2018 | FI | 28.03.2018 | IT | 28.03.2018 | MC | 28.03.2018 | NL | 28.03.2018 | PL | 28.03.2018 | RO | 28.03.2018 | SE | 28.03.2018 | SI | 28.03.2018 | SK | 28.03.2018 | TR | 28.03.2018 | BG | 28.06.2018 | GR | 29.06.2018 | IE | 27.07.2018 | LU | 27.07.2018 | PT | 30.07.2018 | BE | 31.07.2018 | CH | 31.07.2018 | LI | 31.07.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 27.07.2004 | |
AT | 28.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SI | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
TR | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
IE | 27.07.2018 | ||
LU | 27.07.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 28.03.2018 | |
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SI | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
TR | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
IE | 27.07.2018 | ||
LU | 27.07.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AT | 28.03.2018 | |
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SI | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
IE | 27.07.2018 | ||
LU | 27.07.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 28.03.2018 | |
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SI | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
LU | 27.07.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 28.03.2018 | |
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
LU | 27.07.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AT | 28.03.2018 | |
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
LU | 27.07.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AT | 28.03.2018 | |
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
LU | 27.07.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 28.03.2018 | |
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 28.03.2018 | |
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | CZ | 28.03.2018 | |
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | CZ | 28.03.2018 | |
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CZ | 28.03.2018 | |
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | EE | 28.03.2018 | |
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 28.03.2018 | |
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | FI | 28.03.2018 | |
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | FI | 28.03.2018 | |
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | FI | 28.03.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5657752 (LANDIS ROBERT M [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19947722 (MAP GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-3* the whole document *; | [A]EP1099452 (MAP GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]DE10051891 (MAP GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US6119693 (KWOK PHILIP RODNEY [AU], et al); | [X]EP1205205 (WEINMANN G GERAETE MED [DE]); | [X]DE10045183 (MAP GMBH [DE]); | [X]US2003066531 (GRADON LEWIS GEORGE [NZ], et al); | [XP]US2004045551 (EATON JASON P [US], et al); | [XP]WO2004022145 (RESMED LTD [AU], et al) | by applicant | US5243971 | US5570689 | US6112746 | US6119693 | WO0078384 | EP1205205 | DE10045183 | US2003066531 | NZ20030524439 |