EP1652423 - METHOD FOR BREAKING ANTICYCLONIC CIRCULATION AND DEVICE FOR CARRYING OUT SAID METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.07.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.08.2011 [2011/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Protopopov, Vadim Anatolevich ul. Grekova, 14-33 Moscow, 127224 / RU | For all designated states Bologurov, Sergey Vladimirovich d. Mishnevo, 23, Frolovskaya selskaya administratsia, Dzerzhinsky raion Kalushskaya obl., 249710 / RU | For all designated states Rodkin, Roman Eduardovich Vspolny pereulok, 16-2-96 Moscow, 123001 / RU | For all designated states Egorov, Mikhail Andreevich Shipilovskaya ul., 23-2-59 Moscow, 115563 / RU | For all designated states Verzhbitsky, Yaroslav Vladimirovich ul. Dom Rybaka, 1, d. Bolshaya Chernaya, Mytischinsky raion Moskovskaya obl., 14722 / RU | For all designated states Goncharov, Igor Valerievich Zadonsky pr-d, 18-136 Moscow 115682 / RU | For all designated states Bodrov, Dmitry Nikolaevich pr-t Khudozhnikov, 4-2-30 St. Petersburg 194354 / RU | [2006/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PROTOPOPOV, Vadim Anatolevich ul. Grekova, 14-33 Moscow, 127224 / RU | 02 /
BOLOGUROV, S.V., d. Mishnevo, 23 Frolovskaya selskaya admin., Dzerzhinsky raion Kaluzhskaya obl., 249710 / RU | [2006/18] | Representative(s) | Schneider, Henry Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/18] | Schneider, Henry Anwaltskanzlei Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 04748963.8 | 13.07.2004 | [2006/18] | WO2004RU00269 | Priority number, date | RU20030121612 | 16.07.2003 Original published format: RU 2003121612 | [2006/18] | Filing language | RU | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005006844 | Date: | 27.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1652423 | Date: | 03.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 27.01.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A01G15/00, H01T23/00 | [2010/32] | CPC: |
A01G15/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2006/18] | A01G15/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR UNTERBRECHUNG EINER ANTIZYKLONISCHEN ZIRKULATION UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS | [2006/18] | English: | METHOD FOR BREAKING ANTICYCLONIC CIRCULATION AND DEVICE FOR CARRYING OUT SAID METHOD | [2006/18] | French: | PROCEDE DE PERTURBATION DE LA CIRCULATION ANTICYCLONIQUE ET DISPOSITIF DE MISE EN OEUVRE DE CE PROCEDE | [2006/18] | Entry into regional phase | 16.02.2006 | Translation filed | 16.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 16.02.2006 | Search fee paid | 16.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/18] | 07.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/35] | 24.01.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR787608 (FR HELITA SOC) [A] 1 * page 1, line 14 - line 50 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US3284686 (HARRY MOSES, et al) [A] 1-3,5 * column 5, line 5 - column 6, line 43 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US5411209 (OLLIVIER GERALD [CA]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 24 - column 3, line 21 ** figures 1, 2 *; | [X]EP1197138 (PISSAS NIKOLAOS [CY], et al) [X] 1,5 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0006] * * claim 1 * * figures 1, 2 * | International search | [A]RU2090057 ; | [A]RU2105463 ; | [A]RU2060639 ; | [A]US3456880 |