EP1647163 - AN ELECTRIC HEATING ELEMENT THAT INCLUDES A RADIANT TUBE. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sandvik Intellectual Property AB 811 81 Sandviken / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/16] | For all designated states Sandvik Intellectual Property AB 811 81 Sandviken / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEWIN, Thomas Bergslagsvägen 227 B S-734 40 Hallstahammar / SE | [2006/16] | Application number, filing date | 04749086.7 | 29.06.2004 | [2006/16] | WO2004SE01048 | Priority number, date | SE20030002047 | 10.07.2003 Original published format: SE 0302047 | [2006/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005006812 | Date: | 20.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1647163 | Date: | 19.04.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1647163 | Date: | 13.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 20.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H05B3/64 | [2006/16] | CPC: |
H05B3/64 (EP,KR,US);
H05B3/44 (EP,US);
H05B2203/032 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHES HEIZELEMENT MIT EINEM STRAHLUNGSROHR | [2008/49] | English: | AN ELECTRIC HEATING ELEMENT THAT INCLUDES A RADIANT TUBE. | [2006/16] | French: | ELEMENT DE CHAUFFAGE ELECTRIQUE COMPRENANT UN TUBE RADIANT | [2006/16] |
Former [2006/16] | ELEKTRISCHES HEIZELEMENT MIT EINER STRAHLENDEN RÖHRE | Entry into regional phase | 10.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 10.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/16] | 19.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.02.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.05.2009 | BE | 13.05.2009 | CY | 13.05.2009 | CZ | 13.05.2009 | DK | 13.05.2009 | EE | 13.05.2009 | FI | 13.05.2009 | PL | 13.05.2009 | RO | 13.05.2009 | SI | 13.05.2009 | SK | 13.05.2009 | TR | 13.05.2009 | IE | 29.06.2009 | LU | 29.06.2009 | CH | 30.06.2009 | LI | 30.06.2009 | MC | 30.06.2009 | BG | 13.08.2009 | SE | 13.08.2009 | GR | 14.08.2009 | PT | 13.09.2009 | HU | 14.11.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 13.05.2009 | |
BE | 13.05.2009 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2009 | ||
DK | 13.05.2009 | ||
EE | 13.05.2009 | ||
FI | 13.05.2009 | ||
PL | 13.05.2009 | ||
RO | 13.05.2009 | ||
SI | 13.05.2009 | ||
SK | 13.05.2009 | ||
IE | 29.06.2009 | ||
LU | 29.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
BG | 13.08.2009 | ||
SE | 13.08.2009 | ||
GR | 14.08.2009 | ||
PT | 13.09.2009 | ||
HU | 14.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 13.05.2009 | |
BE | 13.05.2009 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2009 | ||
DK | 13.05.2009 | ||
EE | 13.05.2009 | ||
FI | 13.05.2009 | ||
PL | 13.05.2009 | ||
RO | 13.05.2009 | ||
SI | 13.05.2009 | ||
SK | 13.05.2009 | ||
IE | 29.06.2009 | ||
LU | 29.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
BG | 13.08.2009 | ||
SE | 13.08.2009 | ||
GR | 14.08.2009 | ||
PT | 13.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 13.05.2009 | |
BE | 13.05.2009 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2009 | ||
DK | 13.05.2009 | ||
EE | 13.05.2009 | ||
FI | 13.05.2009 | ||
PL | 13.05.2009 | ||
RO | 13.05.2009 | ||
SI | 13.05.2009 | ||
SK | 13.05.2009 | ||
IE | 29.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
BG | 13.08.2009 | ||
SE | 13.08.2009 | ||
GR | 14.08.2009 | ||
PT | 13.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | AT | 13.05.2009 | |
BE | 13.05.2009 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2009 | ||
DK | 13.05.2009 | ||
EE | 13.05.2009 | ||
FI | 13.05.2009 | ||
PL | 13.05.2009 | ||
RO | 13.05.2009 | ||
SI | 13.05.2009 | ||
SK | 13.05.2009 | ||
IE | 29.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
BG | 13.08.2009 | ||
SE | 13.08.2009 | ||
PT | 13.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/18] | AT | 13.05.2009 | |
BE | 13.05.2009 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2009 | ||
DK | 13.05.2009 | ||
EE | 13.05.2009 | ||
FI | 13.05.2009 | ||
PL | 13.05.2009 | ||
RO | 13.05.2009 | ||
SI | 13.05.2009 | ||
SK | 13.05.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
BG | 13.08.2009 | ||
SE | 13.08.2009 | ||
PT | 13.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 13.05.2009 | |
BE | 13.05.2009 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2009 | ||
DK | 13.05.2009 | ||
EE | 13.05.2009 | ||
FI | 13.05.2009 | ||
PL | 13.05.2009 | ||
RO | 13.05.2009 | ||
SI | 13.05.2009 | ||
SK | 13.05.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
SE | 13.08.2009 | ||
PT | 13.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 13.05.2009 | |
FI | 13.05.2009 | ||
PL | 13.05.2009 | ||
SI | 13.05.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
SE | 13.08.2009 | ||
PT | 13.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/01] | AT | 13.05.2009 | |
FI | 13.05.2009 | ||
PL | 13.05.2009 | ||
SI | 13.05.2009 | ||
SE | 13.08.2009 | ||
PT | 13.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/51] | AT | 13.05.2009 | |
FI | 13.05.2009 | ||
SI | 13.05.2009 | ||
SE | 13.08.2009 | ||
PT | 13.09.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2372212 (GERHARD LEWIN); | [A]US4179603 (BELL DAVID V [US], et al) |