EP1649285 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR ANALYSIS OF SAMPLES USING A COMBINED SAMPLE TREATMENT AND SAMPLE CARRIER DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 21.02.2014 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2014 | Refusal of application | published on 26.03.2014 [2014/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EKSTRÖM, Simon Kämnärsvägen 3A:211 226 46 Lund / SE | For all designated states Laurell, Thomas Skolbänksvägen 8 224 67 Lund / SE | For all designated states Marko-Varga, György Kungsgatan 38A 211 47 Malmö / SE | For all designated states Nilsson, Johan Ostra Kennelvägen 7 237 35 Bjarred / SE | For all designated states Wallman, Lars Brandstad 26 270 33 Vollsjo / SE | [2006/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/17] | Representative(s) | Brann AB P.O. Box 3690 Sveavägen 63 103 59 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/46] | Brann AB P.O. Box 12246 102 26 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2010/29] | Neij, Hans Mikael, et al Brann AB Box 17192 104 62 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2009/51] | Neij, Hans Mikael, et al Brann AB Scheelevägen 17 223 70 Lund / SE | ||
Former [2009/32] | Aurell, Henrik, et al Albihns AB P.O. Box 4289 203 14 Malmö / SE | ||
Former [2006/17] | Akerman, Marten Lennart Albihns Malmö AB Box 4289 203 14 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 04749170.9 | 14.07.2004 | [2006/17] | WO2004SE01134 | Priority number, date | SE20030002074 | 15.07.2003 Original published format: SE 0302074 | [2006/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005008244 | Date: | 27.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1649285 | Date: | 26.04.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 27.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/543, B01L3/00 | [2006/17] | CPC: |
H01J49/0418 (EP,US);
B01L3/50255 (EP,US);
G01N33/54366 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0819 (EP,US);
B01L3/0241 (EP,US);
B01L3/50857 (EP,US);
B01L3/5088 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ANALYSE VON PROBEN UNTER VERWENDUNG EINER KOMBINIERTEN PROBENBEHANDLUNGS- UND PROBENTRÄGERVORRICHTUNG | [2006/17] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR ANALYSIS OF SAMPLES USING A COMBINED SAMPLE TREATMENT AND SAMPLE CARRIER DEVICE | [2006/17] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE D'ANALYSE D'ECHANTILLONS UTILISANT UN TRAITEMENT D'ECHANTILLON COMBINE ET UN DISPOSITIF DE SUPPORT D'ECHANTILLON | [2006/17] | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/17] | 23.03.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2013 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2014/13] | 20.09.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.10.2013 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 29.10.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2014/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.11.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9501559 (EVOTEC BIOSYSTEMS GMBH [DE], et al); | [X]WO03054518 (LAURELL THOMAS [SE], et al); | [X]WO0119520 (MILLIPORE CORP [US]); | [A]US6361958 (SHIEH CHAN-LONG [US], et al); | [A]EP1226871 (EBARA CORP [JP]); | [A]US2002094533 (HESS ROBERT A [US], et al) |