EP1656511 - DISC TO CENTRAL PART INTERFACE FOR DISC BRAKES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Haldex Brake Products AB P.O. Box 501 261 24 Landskrona / SE | [2006/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRIPEMARK, Joakim Karl XI-g. 8 A SE-222 20 LUND / SE | 02 /
KÄLL, Patrik Röamöllagatan 71 S-254 43 Helsingborg / SE | 03 /
STENSSON, Göran karöds gård S-277 55 Brösarp / SE | [2009/41] |
Former [2007/09] | 01 /
GRIPEMARK, Joakim Karl XI-g. 8 A SE-222 20 LUND / SE | ||
02 /
KÄLL, Patrik Röamöllagatan 71 S-254 43 Helsingborg / SE | |||
03 /
STENSSON, Göran Akaröds gard S-277 55 Brösarp / SE | |||
Former [2006/20] | 01 /
GRIPEMARK, Joakim O.D. Krooks gata 39 S-254 43 Helsingborg / SE | ||
02 /
KÄLL, Patrik Röamöllagatan 71 S-254 43 Helsingborg / SE | |||
03 /
STENSSON, Göran Akaröds gard S-277 55 Brösarp / SE | Representative(s) | Karlsson, Leif Gunnar Börje Ström & Gulliksson AB P.O. Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/20] | Karlsson, Leif Gunnar Börje Ström & Gulliksson AB P.O. Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 04749210.3 | 18.08.2004 | [2006/20] | WO2004SE01210 | Priority number, date | SE20030002257 | 21.08.2003 Original published format: SE 0302257 | [2006/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005019678 | Date: | 03.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1656511 | Date: | 17.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1656511 | Date: | 07.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 03.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F16D65/12 | [2006/20] | CPC: |
F16D65/12 (EP,US);
F16D2065/1368 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GRENZE ZWISCHEN SCHEIBE UND MITTELTEIL FÜR SCHEIBENBREMSEN | [2006/20] | English: | DISC TO CENTRAL PART INTERFACE FOR DISC BRAKES | [2006/20] | French: | INTERFACE ENTRE LE DISQUE ET LA PARTIE CENTRALE DE FREINS A DISQUE | [2006/20] | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/20] | 20.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 21.08.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.10.2009 | BE | 07.10.2009 | CY | 07.10.2009 | CZ | 07.10.2009 | DK | 07.10.2009 | EE | 07.10.2009 | FI | 07.10.2009 | IT | 07.10.2009 | NL | 07.10.2009 | PL | 07.10.2009 | RO | 07.10.2009 | SE | 07.10.2009 | SI | 07.10.2009 | SK | 07.10.2009 | TR | 07.10.2009 | BG | 07.01.2010 | GR | 08.01.2010 | ES | 18.01.2010 | PT | 08.02.2010 | HU | 08.04.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | AT | 07.10.2009 | |
BE | 07.10.2009 | ||
CY | 07.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2009 | ||
DK | 07.10.2009 | ||
EE | 07.10.2009 | ||
FI | 07.10.2009 | ||
IT | 07.10.2009 | ||
NL | 07.10.2009 | ||
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
RO | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
SK | 07.10.2009 | ||
BG | 07.01.2010 | ||
GR | 08.01.2010 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
HU | 08.04.2010 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 07.10.2009 | |
BE | 07.10.2009 | ||
CY | 07.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2009 | ||
DK | 07.10.2009 | ||
EE | 07.10.2009 | ||
FI | 07.10.2009 | ||
IT | 07.10.2009 | ||
NL | 07.10.2009 | ||
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
RO | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
SK | 07.10.2009 | ||
BG | 07.01.2010 | ||
GR | 08.01.2010 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 07.10.2009 | |
BE | 07.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2009 | ||
DK | 07.10.2009 | ||
EE | 07.10.2009 | ||
FI | 07.10.2009 | ||
IT | 07.10.2009 | ||
NL | 07.10.2009 | ||
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
RO | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
SK | 07.10.2009 | ||
BG | 07.01.2010 | ||
GR | 08.01.2010 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 07.10.2009 | |
BE | 07.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2009 | ||
DK | 07.10.2009 | ||
EE | 07.10.2009 | ||
FI | 07.10.2009 | ||
NL | 07.10.2009 | ||
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
RO | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
SK | 07.10.2009 | ||
BG | 07.01.2010 | ||
GR | 08.01.2010 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/39] | AT | 07.10.2009 | |
BE | 07.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2009 | ||
DK | 07.10.2009 | ||
EE | 07.10.2009 | ||
FI | 07.10.2009 | ||
NL | 07.10.2009 | ||
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
RO | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
SK | 07.10.2009 | ||
BG | 07.01.2010 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | AT | 07.10.2009 | |
BE | 07.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2009 | ||
DK | 07.10.2009 | ||
EE | 07.10.2009 | ||
FI | 07.10.2009 | ||
NL | 07.10.2009 | ||
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
RO | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
BG | 07.01.2010 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 07.10.2009 | |
BE | 07.10.2009 | ||
DK | 07.10.2009 | ||
EE | 07.10.2009 | ||
FI | 07.10.2009 | ||
NL | 07.10.2009 | ||
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
RO | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
BG | 07.01.2010 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 07.10.2009 | |
BE | 07.10.2009 | ||
FI | 07.10.2009 | ||
NL | 07.10.2009 | ||
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/29] | AT | 07.10.2009 | |
BE | 07.10.2009 | ||
FI | 07.10.2009 | ||
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/23] | FI | 07.10.2009 | |
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/22] | FI | 07.10.2009 | |
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | SI | 07.10.2009 | |
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/11] | SI | 07.10.2009 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4605103 (CARRE JEAN-JACQUES [FR], et al); | [Y]US5046596 (DENNERT R BRUCE [US]); | [X]US5213437 (SOMMER RUDOLF [DE]) | Examination | FR1152328 | WO8905924 | WO0198681 | by applicant | WO8905924 |