EP1609004 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DETECTION OF EXPLOSIVES IN BAGGAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.03.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.04.2013 [2013/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Reveal Imaging Technologies, Inc. 201 Burlington Road Bedford MA 01730 / US | [2005/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ELLENBOGEN, Michael 2 Plainview Road Wayland, MA 01778 / US | 02 /
SCHEINMAN, Elan 3884 Autumn Drive Redwood City, CA 94061 / US | [2005/52] | Representative(s) | Grubert, Andreas, et al King & Spalding International LLP 125 Old Broad Street London EC2N 1AR / GB | [2011/11] |
Former [2005/52] | Potter, Julian Mark, et al Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky and Popeo Intellectual Property LLP, The Rectory, 9 Ironmonger Lane London EC2V 8EY / GB | Application number, filing date | 04749681.5 | 02.04.2004 | [2005/52] | WO2004US10240 | Priority number, date | US20030459664P | 02.04.2003 Original published format: US 459664 P | [2005/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004090576 | Date: | 21.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1609004 | Date: | 28.12.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01V5/00 | [2005/52] | CPC: |
G01V5/226 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/52] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERKENNUNG VON EXPLOSIVSTOFFEN IN GEPÄCK | [2005/52] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DETECTION OF EXPLOSIVES IN BAGGAGE | [2005/52] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE RESOLUTION DES MENACES DANS LA DETECTION AUTOMATISEE DES EXPLOSIFS A L'INTERIEUR DES BAGAGES ET AUTRES COLIS | [2005/52] | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/01] | 05.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/17] | 07.12.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/17] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.07.2007 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 21.04.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 21.04.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2012 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5367552 (PESCHMANN KRISTIAN R [US]) [X] 1,2,4-13 * column 4, line 37 - line 65 * * column 6, line 39 - line 53 * * abstract * * column 8, line 33 - line 50 * * column 9, line 25 - line 48 * * column 10, line 47 - line 68 * * column 11, line 16 - line 68 * * column 12, line 1 - line 60 * * figure - * * column 7, line 53 - column 8, line 2 *; | [A]WO9613839 (LOCKHEED MARTIN SPECIALTY COMP [US]) [A] 1,3,10,14,15 * page 8, line 24 - page 10, line 12 * * page 6, line 15 - line 33 * * page 16, line 30 - line 33 * * page 25, line 17 - line 20 * * figure - *; | [A]US2002176531 (MCCLELLAND KEITH M [US], et al) [A] 1,2,7,11,15 * abstract * * page 2, paragraph 28 - page 3, paragraph 33 * * page 6, paragraph 48 - paragraph 50 * * page 9, paragraph 64 - paragraph 66 *; | [AP]WO03029844 (L 3 COMM SECURITY & DETECTION [US]) [AP] 1,2,7,11,15 * abstract * * page 1, line 30 - page 2, line 10 * * page 3, line 10 - page 4, line 21 * * page 5, line 15 - page 6, line 7 * * page 11, line 16 - line 22 ** figure - * |