EP1611264 - THERMAL BARRIER COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.03.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.04.2010 [2010/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microphase Coatings, Inc. 170 Donmoor Court Garner, NC 27529 / US | [2006/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIMENDINGER, William, H., III 3916 Yateswood Court Raleigh, NC 27603 / US | 02 /
GARRETT, David, William 1009 Snow Peak Ct. Raleigh, NC 27603 / US | [2007/10] |
Former [2006/01] | 01 /
SIMENDINGER, William, H., III 3916 Yateswood Court Raleigh, NC 27603 / US | ||
02 /
GARRETT, David, William 3077 Bunker Hill Circle Marietta, GA 30062 / US | Representative(s) | Horner, Martin Grenville Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/01] | Horner, Martin Grenville Marks & Clerk Scotland 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE Scotland / GB | Application number, filing date | 04749782.1 | 05.04.2004 | [2006/01] | WO2004US10539 | Priority number, date | US20030461800P | 10.04.2003 Original published format: US 461800 P | [2006/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004092437 | Date: | 28.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1611264 | Date: | 04.01.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.06.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B32B9/04 | [2006/34] | CPC: |
C08L83/04 (EP,US);
C09D183/04 (EP,US);
C09D5/18 (EP,US);
C08G77/14 (EP,US);
C08G77/18 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31663 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L83/04, C08L83/00 (EP,US);
C09D183/04, C08L83/00 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2006/01] | C23C2/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄRMEDÄMMZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2006/01] | English: | THERMAL BARRIER COMPOSITION | [2006/01] | French: | COMPOSITION DE BARRIERE THERMIQUE | [2006/01] | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.2005 | Search fee paid | 29.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.2005 | Examination requested [2006/01] | 03.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/17] | 09.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2009 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9516751 (BP CHEMICALS HITCO INC [US]) [A] 1 * claims 1-4,21 ** page 12, line 8 - page 13, line 3 *; | [A]WO02059210 (MICROPHASE COATINGS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * claims 1-52 * | International search | [A]US4510283 (TAKEDA SHIRO [JP], et al); | [A]JPS60254034 (FUJITSU LTD); | [A]US5492730 (BALABA WILLY M [US], et al) |