EP1615987 - VOC FREE COATINGS STRIPPERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.03.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.04.2009 [2009/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vocfree, Inc. 163 South Street Hackensack, NJ 07601 / US | [2006/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUGERMAN, Gerald 8 Cambridge Drive Allendale, NJ 07401 / US | 02 /
COSBY, James, V. 180 Midway Oval Groton, CT 06340 / US | [2006/03] | Representative(s) | Adam, Holger, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/03] | Adam, Holger, et al Kraus & Weisert, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04749842.3 | 05.04.2004 | [2006/03] | WO2004US10666 | Priority number, date | US20030460060P | 03.04.2003 Original published format: US 460060 P | [2006/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004090085 | Date: | 21.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1615987 | Date: | 18.01.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.10.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/43, C11D3/30, B08B3/04, C11D3/20, C11D7/50 | [2006/27] | CPC: |
C11D3/43 (EP,KR,US);
C11D3/2068 (EP,KR,US);
C11D3/2093 (EP,KR,US);
C11D3/30 (EP,KR,US);
C11D7/5013 (EP,KR,US);
C11D7/5022 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/03] | C11D1/72, C11D3/30, B08B3/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/03] | Extension states | AL | 28.10.2005 | HR | 28.10.2005 | LT | 28.10.2005 | LV | 28.10.2005 | MK | 28.10.2005 | Title | German: | VOC-FREIE LACKENTFERNER | [2006/03] | English: | VOC FREE COATINGS STRIPPERS | [2006/03] | French: | DECAPANTS SANS COV | [2006/03] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2005 | Search fee paid | 28.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/03] | 12.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/18] | 12.12.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2009/18] | Request for further processing for: | 26.04.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 26.04.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.05.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4243559 (IMAMURA TETSUYA, et al) [X] 1,5-10,13-15,17,19,20 * examples 1,3; claim - *; | [X]DE4007980 (SAFETY KLEEN CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,5-10,13-15,17,19,20 * claim - *; | [X]US5035829 (SUWALA DAVID W [US]) [X] 1,3-20 * claim -; table - *; | [X]US5419848 (VANEENAM DONALD N [US]) [X] 1,2,5-11,13-15,17,19,20 * column 5; examples 29,32; claim - *; | [X]WO9732968 (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US]) [X] 1,3-10,13-20 * example 1; claim - *; | [X]WO9732937 (JOHNSON CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,5-10,13-15,17,19,20* examples 2,4; claim - *; | [X]US5733380 (MURPHY DONALD P [US]) [X] 1,3-20 * column 8; claim -; table 1 *; | [X]US5958298 (NAGOSHI EIJI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,5-11,13-15,17,19,20 * example 6; claim - *; | [X]WO0246350 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [X] 1,2,5-10,13-15,17,19,20 * example 2; claim -; table - * | International search | [X]US3954648 (BELCAK EDWARD JOHN, et al) |