EP1618178 - NOVEL GLUE FOR CARTILAGE REPAIR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.05.2009 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Musculoskeletal Transplant Foundation Edison Corporate Center, 125 May Street, Suite 300 Edison New Jersey 08837-9947 / US | [2008/24] |
Former [2007/16] | For all designated states Musculoskeletal Transplant Foundation Edison Corporate Center, 125 May Street, Suite 300 Edison New Jersey 08837-9947 / US | ||
For all designated states Gomes, Katherine, A. 4 Riverview Terrace Hillsborough New Jersey 08844 / US | |||
For all designated states Sunwoo, Moon Hae 28 Lakeview Drive Old Tappan, NJ 07675 / US | |||
For all designated states Gertzman, Arthur, A. 9 Orchard Lane Lebanon, NJ 08833 / US | |||
For all designated states Tomford, William, W. 72 Pinehurst Road Belmont, MA 02478 / US | |||
Former [2006/04] | For all designated states Musculoskeletal Transplant Foundation Edison Corporate Center, 125 May Street, Suite 300 Edison New Jersey 08837-9947 / US | ||
For all designated states Gomes, Katherine, A. 470 East Main Street Somerville, NJ 08876 / US | |||
For all designated states Sunwoo, Moon Hae 28 Lakeview Drive Old Tappan, NJ 07675 / US | |||
For all designated states Gertzman, Arthur, A. 9 Orchard Lane Lebanon, NJ 08833 / US | |||
For all designated states Tomford, William, W. 72 Pinehurst Road Belmont, MA 02478 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TRUNCALE, Katherine, A. 4 Riverview Terrace, Hillsborough New Jersey 08844 / US | 02 /
SUNWOO, Moon Hae 28 Lakeview Drive Old Tappan, NJ 07675 / US | 03 /
GERTZMAN, Arthur, A. 9 Orchard Lane Lebanon, NJ 08833 / US | 04 /
TOMFORD, William, W. 72 Pinehurst Road Belmont, MA 02478 / US | [2007/31] |
Former [2006/04] | 01 /
GOMES, Katherine, A. 470 East Main Street Somerville, NJ 08876 / US | ||
02 /
SUNWOO, Moon Hae 28 Lakeview Drive Old Tappan, NJ 07675 / US | |||
03 /
GERTZMAN, Arthur, A. 9 Orchard Lane Lebanon, NJ 08833 / US | |||
04 /
TOMFORD, William, W. 72 Pinehurst Road Belmont, MA 02478 / US | Representative(s) | McCall, John Douglas, et al WP Thompson Coopers Building Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | McCall, John Douglas, et al W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | ||
Former [2007/32] | McCall, John Douglas, et al W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Coopers Building Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | ||
Former [2006/04] | McCall, John Douglas W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Coopers Building Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | Application number, filing date | 04749924.9 | 21.04.2004 | [2006/04] | WO2004US10956 | Priority number, date | US20030424765 | 29.04.2003 Original published format: US 424765 | [2006/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004096983 | Date: | 11.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1618178 | Date: | 25.01.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1618178 | Date: | 16.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.12.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/32 | [2006/08] | CPC: |
A61F2/30756 (EP,US);
A61F2/28 (US);
A61K35/28 (EP,US);
A61K35/32 (EP,US);
A61K38/18 (EP,US);
A61K38/28 (EP,US);
A61L27/20 (EP,US);
A61L27/24 (EP,US);
A61L27/3612 (EP,US);
A61L27/3654 (EP,US);
A61L27/3683 (EP,US);
A61L27/3817 (EP,US);
A61L27/3821 (EP,US);
A61L27/3834 (EP,US);
A61L27/3852 (EP,US);
A61L27/48 (EP,US);
A61L27/56 (EP,US);
A61L27/58 (EP,US);
A61B17/00491 (EP,US);
A61F2/30744 (EP,US);
A61F2/3094 (EP,US);
A61F2/3859 (EP,US);
A61F2002/2817 (EP,US);
A61F2002/2835 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30062 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30224 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30225 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30759 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30764 (EP,US);
A61F2210/0004 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0069 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00365 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00383 (EP,US);
A61L2430/06 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K35/28, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K38/18, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K38/28, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61L27/20, C08L5/08 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2006/04] | C12N1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEUARTIGER KLEBSTOFF ZUR KNORPELREPARATUR | [2006/04] | English: | NOVEL GLUE FOR CARTILAGE REPAIR | [2006/04] | French: | NOUVEL ADHESIF DESTINE A LA REPARATION DU CARTILAGE | [2006/04] | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.2005 | Search fee paid | 13.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/04] | 08.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2008 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   27.05.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.07.2008 | BE | 16.07.2008 | CY | 16.07.2008 | CZ | 16.07.2008 | DK | 16.07.2008 | EE | 16.07.2008 | FI | 16.07.2008 | NL | 16.07.2008 | PL | 16.07.2008 | RO | 16.07.2008 | SI | 16.07.2008 | SK | 16.07.2008 | TR | 16.07.2008 | BG | 16.10.2008 | SE | 16.10.2008 | GR | 17.10.2008 | PT | 16.12.2008 | HU | 17.01.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
BE | 16.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2008 | ||
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
PL | 16.07.2008 | ||
RO | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
SE | 16.10.2008 | ||
GR | 17.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
HU | 17.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
BE | 16.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2008 | ||
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
PL | 16.07.2008 | ||
RO | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
SE | 16.10.2008 | ||
GR | 17.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/24] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
BE | 16.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2008 | ||
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
PL | 16.07.2008 | ||
RO | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
SE | 16.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
BE | 16.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2008 | ||
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
RO | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
SE | 16.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/26] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
BE | 16.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2008 | ||
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
RO | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
BE | 16.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2008 | ||
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
BE | 16.07.2008 | ||
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
BE | 16.07.2008 | ||
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | FI | 16.07.2008 | |
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5236456 (O'LEARY ROBERT K [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * claims 1,12 *; | [A]EP1127581 (MUSCULOSKELETAL TRANSPLANT [US]) [A] 1-12 * claims 1-17 *; | [X]WO02058484 (COLLAGEN II NUTRITION INC [US]) [X] 1-12 * abstract *; | [E]US2004219182 (GOMES KATHERINE A [US], et al) [E] 1-12* claims 34-38 * | International search | [AP]US6838440 (STILES TERRI LYNN [US]) |